GORDON et al v PHILLIP et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ELLERSHAW, TRAVIS GORDON and FTP INVESTMENTS, INC.
Defendant: LAWRENCE HARRIS, III, JARVIS ADDISON, VICTOR A. SUAREZ MELENDEZ, EDUARDO OJEDA, ANDREU PHILLIP, NEW INNOVATION GROUP CONSULTANTS, LLC doing business as LEAFY GRAM, EARL L. PHILLIP, RODOLFO (RUDY) VAZQUEZ ZAYAS, ANDREU PHILLIP doing business as LEAFY GRAM, LAWRENCE HARRIS, III doing business as LEAFY GRAM, EDGARDO OJEDA doing business as LEAFY GRAM, EARL L. PHILLIP doing business as LEAFY GRAM, RODOLFO (RUDY) VAZQUEZ ZAYAS doing business as LEAFY GRAM, LESTER PHILLIP doing business as LEAFY GRAM, JARVIS ADDISON doing business as LEAFY GRAM and VICTOR A. SUAREZ MELENDEZ doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Case Number: 1:2021cv00029
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EARL L. PHILLIP, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ANDREU PHILLIP filed by MICHAEL ELLERSHAW, FTP INVESTMENTS, INC., TRAVIS GORDON. Replies due by 3/19/2021 (DUFFY, PAMELA)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FTP INVESTMENTS, INC., MICHAEL ELLERSHAW, TRAVIS GORDON as to VICTOR A. SUAREZ MELENDEZ served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. Maria Antonia Melendez Briganty (DUFFY, PAMELA) (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/26/2021 with redacted version per attorney.) (Hicks, Samantha)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FTP INVESTMENTS, INC., MICHAEL ELLERSHAW, TRAVIS GORDON as to JARVIS ADDISON served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (DUFFY, PAMELA)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FTP INVESTMENTS, INC., MICHAEL ELLERSHAW, TRAVIS GORDON as to NEW INNOVATION GROUP CONSULTANTS, LLC served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (DUFFY, PAMELA)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FTP INVESTMENTS, INC., MICHAEL ELLERSHAW, TRAVIS GORDON as to EARL L. PHILLIP served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (DUFFY, PAMELA)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FTP INVESTMENTS, INC., MICHAEL ELLERSHAW, TRAVIS GORDON as to ANDREU PHILLIP served on 1/24/2001, answer due 2/14/2001. (DUFFY, PAMELA)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS AND ANSWER by EARL L. PHILLIP. Response to Motion due by 3/22/2021. (Hicks, Samantha)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to LAWRENCE HARRIS, III. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney ANDREU L. PHILLIP, ESQ. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 3/18/2021. (Hicks, Samantha)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS AND ANSWER by ANDREU PHILLIP. Response to Motion due by 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Hicks, Samantha)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to RODOLFO (RUDY) VAZQUEZ ZAYAS. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by FTP INVESTMENTS, INC., MICHAEL ELLERSHAW, TRAVIS GORDON.(DUFFY, PAMELA)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 12, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 12, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2963421), filed by TRAVIS GORDON, MICHAEL ELLERSHAW, FTP INVESTMENTS, INC. (DUFFY, PAMELA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GORDON et al v PHILLIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE HARRIS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARVIS ADDISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR A. SUAREZ MELENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDUARDO OJEDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREU PHILLIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW INNOVATION GROUP CONSULTANTS, LLC doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EARL L. PHILLIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODOLFO (RUDY) VAZQUEZ ZAYAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREU PHILLIP doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Represented By: ANDREU L. PHILLIP, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE HARRIS, III doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDGARDO OJEDA doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EARL L. PHILLIP doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODOLFO (RUDY) VAZQUEZ ZAYAS doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESTER PHILLIP doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARVIS ADDISON doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR A. SUAREZ MELENDEZ doing business as LEAFY GRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ELLERSHAW
Represented By: PAMELA S. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS GORDON
Represented By: PAMELA S. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FTP INVESTMENTS, INC.
Represented By: PAMELA S. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?