SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC v. WINEBRENNER et al
Plaintiff: SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC doing business as NATIONAL AGENTS ALLIANCE
Defendant: HELEN HILTON-JONES, PAUL VAN THOF, ADA CRAIN, STEPHANIE WINEBRENNER, WILLIAM PARRIES, III, BILLY G. CRAIN, KYLE J. WINEBRENNER and MILES GAYDOS
Case Number: 1:2021cv00090
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 18 Corrected Document re #15 Brief. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kyle Winebrenner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(HAMPTON, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 3/24/2021 to correct event. (Hicks, Samantha)
March 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DANIEL ALAN M. RULEY on behalf of Defendants MILES GAYDOS, PAUL VAN THOF, KYLE J. WINEBRENNER, STEPHANIE WINEBRENNER (RULEY, DANIEL)
March 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER R. HAMPTON on behalf of Defendants MILES GAYDOS, PAUL VAN THOF, KYLE J. WINEBRENNER, STEPHANIE WINEBRENNER (HAMPTON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF re #9 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, Defendants Kyle J. Winebrenner and Stephanie Winebrenner's Brief In Support of Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(HAMPTON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 19, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Set Aside #9 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, by MILES GAYDOS, PAUL VAN THOF, KYLE J. WINEBRENNER, STEPHANIE WINEBRENNER. Response to Motion due by 4/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HAMPTON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 18, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed), to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
March 18, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. ADA CRAIN, BILLY G. CRAIN, HELEN HILTON-JONES, and WILLIAM PARRIES, III shall answer or otherwise respond by 05/11/2021. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/18/2021. (AULD, L.)
March 18, 2021 ***Attorney JEFFREY B. KUYKENDAL for HELEN HILTON-JONES,JEFFREY B. KUYKENDAL for WILLIAM PARRIES, III added. (Butler, Carol)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by ADA CRAIN, BILLY G. CRAIN. (KUYKENDAL, JEFFREY)
March 17, 2021 ELECTRONIC NOTICE to/from counsel for plaintiff re: position to #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Plaintiff consent to #12 Motion for Extension of Time. (Williamson, Wanda)
March 17, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. MILES GAYDOS shall answer or otherwise respond by 05/11/2021. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/17/2021. (AULD, L.)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MILES GAYDOS. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol)
March 16, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Williamson, Wanda)
March 14, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. PAUL VAN THOF shall answer or otherwise respond by 05/11/2021. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/14/2021. (AULD, L.)
March 12, 2021 Email notification from Attorney Robert King, III on 3/12/2021 stating consent to #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Garrett, Kim)
March 12, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by PAUL VAN THOF. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butler, Carol)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC re #9 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT signed by John S. Brubaker on 3/3/21, that this matter comes before the undersigned Clerk of Court on Plaintiff Superior Performers, Inc., d/b/a National Agents Alliance's ("Plaintiff"), motion for entry of default as to Defendants Kyle J. Winebrenner and Stephanie Winebrenner pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). (D.E. 6). Upon consideration of the motion, and for the reasons stated in Plaintiff's memorandum in support of its motion for entry of default, Plaintiff's motion (D.E. #6 ) is GRANTED. Default is hereby ENTERED against defendants Kyle J. Winebrenner and Stephanie Winebrenner. (Butler, Carol)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Kyle J. Winebrenner and Stephanie Winebrenner Text of Proposed Order. (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Kyle J. Winebrenner and Stephanie Winebrenner filed by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC. (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/1/2021) (Butler, Carol).
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Kyle J. Winebrenner and Stephanie Winebrenner by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service)(ROBERTSON, WILLIAM) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/1/2021) (Butler, Carol).
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM A. ROBERTSON on behalf of Plaintiff SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Helen Hilton-Jones, William Parries, III and by ADA CRAIN, BILLY G. CRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KUYKENDAL, JEFFREY)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for ADA CRAIN; BILLY G. CRAIN; HELEN HILTON-JONES; and WILLIAM PARRIES, III. Answer due by 3/19/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 2/25/2021. (Brubaker, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Stephanie Winebrenner, #2 Summons - Billy G. Crain, #3 Summons - Ada Crain, #4 Summons - Helen Hilton-Jones, #5 Summons - Paul Van Thof, #6 Summons - William Parries, III, #7 Summons - Miles Gaydos) (Sheets, Jamie)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2978622), filed by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K Winebrenner ICA, #2 Exhibit S Winebrenner ICA, #3 Exhibit B Crain ICA, #4 Exhibit A Crain ICA, #5 Exhibit H Jones ICA, #6 Exhibit P Van Thof ICA, #7 Exhibit W Parries ICA, #8 Exhibit M Gaydos ICA) (KING, ROBERT)
February 2, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 2, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 2, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC v. WINEBRENNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, LLC doing business as NATIONAL AGENTS ALLIANCE
Represented By: ROBERT JAMES KING, III
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HELEN HILTON-JONES
Represented By: JEFFREY B. KUYKENDAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL VAN THOF
Represented By: DANIEL ALAN M. RULEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. HAMPTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADA CRAIN
Represented By: JEFFREY B. KUYKENDAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE WINEBRENNER
Represented By: DANIEL ALAN M. RULEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. HAMPTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM PARRIES, III
Represented By: JEFFREY B. KUYKENDAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLY G. CRAIN
Represented By: JEFFREY B. KUYKENDAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE J. WINEBRENNER
Represented By: DANIEL ALAN M. RULEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. HAMPTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILES GAYDOS
Represented By: DANIEL ALAN M. RULEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. HAMPTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?