MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C., et al v. THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.
Plaintiff: MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. and MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,
Defendant: THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00107
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney R. ROBERT IMAD EL-JAOUHARI on behalf of Defendant THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. (EL-JAOUHARI, R. ROBERT)
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COX, MATTHEW)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. Response to Motion due by 4/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Memo Exhibits)(COX, MATTHEW)
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 4/26/2021 (Winchester, Robin)
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ANTHONY J. JORGENSON on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,, MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3009490.) (JORGENSON, ANTHONY)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Appointing RICHARD D. CONNER, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(b). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Bond, Melisa)
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 03/15/2021, granting #11 Motion for Protective Order as set out herein. (Taylor, Abby)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT ANDLOCAL RULE 5.5 REPORT signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 03/15/2021. Discovery shall be placed on a case-management track designated in LR 26.1(a) as Complex. Plaintiffs' Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2021., Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2021., Discovery due by 09/13/2021., Joinder of Parties for Plaintiffs due by 4/15/2021., Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 4/15/2021.The parties agree that the mediator shall be Richard Conner. The parties do not, at this time, consent to trial by a Magistrate Judge Trial of the action is expected to take approximately 2-3 days. A jury trial has not been demanded.(Taylor, Abby)
March 15, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #9 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, #10 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties, #11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
March 15, 2021 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 5/28/2021. (Bond, Melisa)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,, MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. Response to Motion due by 3/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FCC Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Agreed Protective Order)(WAGNER, KATIE)
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,, MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP..(WAGNER, KATIE)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,, MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP..(WAGNER, KATIE)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney KATIE N. WAGNER on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,, MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3004323.) (WAGNER, KATIE)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 4/21/2021 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (COX, MATTHEW) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/26/2021 with permanent pdf image.) (Taylor, Abby).
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.. (COX, MATTHEW)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (BYRNE, MICHAEL)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2982616), filed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BYRNE, MICHAEL)
February 8, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 8, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 8, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C., et al v. THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BYRNE
Represented By: ANTHONY J. JORGENSON
Represented By: KATIE N. WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, L.L.C.,
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BYRNE
Represented By: ANTHONY J. JORGENSON
Represented By: KATIE N. WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DIVERSIFIED UTILITY GROUP L.L.C.
Represented By: R. ROBERT IMAD EL-JAOUHARI
Represented By: MATTHEW E. COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?