STILLWELL v. UNITED STATES et al
Plaintiff: ANDREA STILLWELL
Defendant: UNITED STATES and DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00298
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Roseboro Letter as to Plaintiff ANDREA STILLWELL. RE #6 MOTION to Dismiss by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES. (Taylor, Abby)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES. (ZELLER, BRANDON)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2021 (ZELLER, BRANDON)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION served on 4/14/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Plaintiff shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ANDREA STILLWELL. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 402.00. Receipt Number NCM053898. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STILLWELL v. UNITED STATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: BRANDON D. ZELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: BRANDON D. ZELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA STILLWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?