WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC v. EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC
Defendant: EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC and EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST
Case Number: 1:2021cv00329
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney BARRY D. HUNTER on behalf of Plaintiff WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3074999.) (HUNTER, BARRY)
June 10, 2021 Filing 17 BRIEF re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC filed by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(O'BRIEN, D.)
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/1/2021 (O'BRIEN, D.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CAMERON B. ROBERTS on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3061473.) (ROBERTS, CAMERON)
June 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JULIA B. STONE on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3061463.) (STONE, JULIA)
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MICHAEL A. CAPLAN on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3061409.) (CAPLAN, MICHAEL)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'BRIEN, D.)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST and EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. Answer due by 6/10/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 5/4/2021. (Brubaker, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC (BROWN, ANDREW)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 Corrected document re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (O'BRIEN, D.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 Corrected document re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (O'BRIEN, D.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Original filed in Guilford County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-4712, issued 4/20/2021, and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC, filed by WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC. (Original filed in Guilford County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-4712, and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KEARNS DAVIS on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC (DAVIS, KEARNS)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney D. J. O'BRIEN, III on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC (O'BRIEN, D.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (O'BRIEN, D.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (O'BRIEN, D.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3036045.), filed by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(O'BRIEN, D.)
April 26, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 26, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC v. EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC
Represented By: KEARNS DAVIS
Represented By: D. J. O'BRIEN, III
Represented By: CAMERON B. ROBERTS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. CAPLAN
Represented By: JULIA B. STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST
Represented By: KEARNS DAVIS
Represented By: D. J. O'BRIEN, III
Represented By: CAMERON B. ROBERTS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. CAPLAN
Represented By: JULIA B. STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Represented By: BARRY D. HUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?