GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY v. ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY and PACKAGING CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00338
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by PACKAGING CORPORATION OF AMERICA. For good cause shown, Defendant Packaging Corporation of America shall have up to and including June 30, 2021 within which time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 5/26/2021.(Lee, Pedra)
May 24, 2021 Motion Referred re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Welch, Kelly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PACKAGING CORPORATION OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time)(HARRELL, LESLIE)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ALAN W. DUNCAN on behalf of Defendant PACKAGING CORPORATION OF AMERICA (DUNCAN, ALAN)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LESLIE COOPER HARRELL on behalf of Defendant PACKAGING CORPORATION OF AMERICA (HARRELL, LESLIE)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PACKAGING CORPORATION OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Packaging Corporation of America) (Sheets, Jamie)
April 29, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 29, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DANIEL T. STRONG on behalf of Plaintiff GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY (STRONG, DANIEL)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM A. BULFER on behalf of Plaintiff GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY (BULFER, WILLIAM)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY by GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Owners) (BULFER, WILLIAM)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3038242), filed by GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Kellie S. Wallace v. Packaging Corporation of America, #2 Exhibit B - Transportation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Great West Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Ace Policy, #5 Exhibit E - 2.19.21 Great West Tender Letter to Chubb, #6 Exhibit F - 3.17.21 Chubb Rejection of Great West Request) (BULFER, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY v. ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACKAGING CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: LESLIE COOPER HARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL T. STRONG
Represented By: WILLIAM A. BULFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?