COX et al v. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Plaintiff: FELICIA MCILWAIN, JOE OVERCASH, WESLEY H. WILLIAMS, BERNETTE MELVIN, PATRICIA A. TURNER, ERNSHILDA D. WILSON, LINDA R. BUONAIUTO, JACQUELINE ROCHELLE DAVIS, JERRY L. WINGATE, PAMELA ANN SLOAN, DAVID HASTON SNOW, JOHN DOE 26, JACQUELINE C. COX, REGINA WILSON, MICHAEL D. ARTUSO, EDWARD MCKEITHAN and PIERRE SMITH
Defendant: GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00481
Filed: June 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.'S CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/9/2021; that the Motion [Doc. #7 ] is GRANTED. Gilead's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to August 23, 2021. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 7, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Williamson, Wanda)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FELDMAN, STEPHEN)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (FELDMAN, STEPHEN)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney AMANDA P. NITTO on behalf of Defendant GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (NITTO, AMANDA)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney STEPHEN DANIEL FELDMAN on behalf of Defendant GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (FELDMAN, STEPHEN)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Hicks, Samantha)
June 14, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha)
June 14, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha)
June 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3066820.), filed by LINDA R. BUONAIUTO, JACQUELINE ROCHELLE DAVIS, WESLEY H. WILLIAMS, BERNETTE MELVIN, JACQUELINE C. COX, REGINA WILSON, PAMELA ANN SLOAN, FELICIA MCILWAIN, DAVID HASTON SNOW, JOE OVERCASH, MICHAEL D. ARTUSO, PIERRE SMITH, PATRICIA A. TURNER, JERRY L. WINGATE, EDWARD MCKEITHAN, JOHN 26 DOE, ERNSHILDA D. WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BEESON, EMILY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COX et al v. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA MCILWAIN
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE OVERCASH
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY H. WILLIAMS
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNETTE MELVIN
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A. TURNER
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNSHILDA D. WILSON
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA R. BUONAIUTO
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE ROCHELLE DAVIS
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY L. WINGATE
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA ANN SLOAN
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HASTON SNOW
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 26
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE C. COX
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINA WILSON
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL D. ARTUSO
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD MCKEITHAN
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIERRE SMITH
Represented By: EMILY J. BEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA P. NITTO
Represented By: STEPHEN DANIEL FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?