INDIANA PAIN AND SPINE CLINIC, LLC et al v. CAROLINA LIQUID CHEMISTRIES CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: AMIR KAZI and INDIANA PAIN AND SPINE CLINIC, LLC
Defendant: MR. PHIL SHUGART, MRS. PATRICIA SHUGART and CAROLINA LIQUID CHEMISTRIES CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00543
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAROLINA LIQUID CHEMISTRIES CORPORATION. (HOLTON, WALTER)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHERYL D. ANDREWS on behalf of Defendants CAROLINA LIQUID CHEMISTRIES CORPORATION, PATRICIA SHUGART, PHIL SHUGART (ANDREWS, CHERYL)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WALTER CLINTON HOLTON, JR on behalf of Defendants CAROLINA LIQUID CHEMISTRIES CORPORATION, PATRICIA SHUGART, PHIL SHUGART (HOLTON, WALTER)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INDIANA PAIN AND SPINE CLINIC, LLC, AMIR KAZI. PHIL SHUGART waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (EMANUEL, KNICOLE)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INDIANA PAIN AND SPINE CLINIC, LLC, AMIR KAZI. PATRICIA SHUGART waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (EMANUEL, KNICOLE)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INDIANA PAIN AND SPINE CLINIC, LLC, AMIR KAZI. CAROLINA LIQUID CHEMISTRIES CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (EMANUEL, KNICOLE)
July 2, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff INDIANA PAIN AND SPINE CLINIC, LLC. (EMANUEL, KNICOLE)
July 1, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAROLINA LIQUID CHEMISTRIES CORPORATION, PATRICIA SHUGART, PHIL SHUGART. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Phil Shugart, #2 Summons - Patricia Shugart) (Hicks, Samantha)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (EMANUEL, KNICOLE)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3079050.), filed by Indiana Pain and Spine, LLC, Amir Kazi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CC Equipment Sales Agreement, #2 Exhibit CLC 2010 Press Release, #3 Exhibit CLC 2013 Urine Drug Testing Manual, #4 Exhibit CLC Marketing Pamphlet, #5 Exhibit Billing Email, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Settlement Agreement)(EMANUEL, KNICOLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDIANA PAIN AND SPINE CLINIC, LLC et al v. CAROLINA LIQUID CHEMISTRIES CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMIR KAZI
Represented By: KNICOLE C. EMANUEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA PAIN AND SPINE CLINIC, LLC
Represented By: KNICOLE C. EMANUEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. PHIL SHUGART
Represented By: WALTER CLINTON HOLTON, JR.
Represented By: CHERYL D. ANDREWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRS. PATRICIA SHUGART
Represented By: WALTER CLINTON HOLTON, JR.
Represented By: CHERYL D. ANDREWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA LIQUID CHEMISTRIES CORPORATION
Represented By: WALTER CLINTON HOLTON, JR.
Represented By: CHERYL D. ANDREWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?