KARZO v. MATADOR RECORDS, INC., et al
Plaintiff: MOHAMED ALASSANE KARZO
Defendant: MATADOR RECORDS, INC., DOMINO PUBLISHING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., REDEYE, INC., M'DOU MOCTAR, MAHAMADOU SOULEYMANE, MICHAEL COLTUN, AHMOUDOU MADASSANE, IBRAHIM SOULEYMANE and SOULEYMANE IBRAHIM
Case Number: 1:2021cv00667
Filed: August 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by REDEYE, INC.. (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant REDEYE, INC.. (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES on behalf of Defendant REDEYE, INC. (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MOHAMED ALASSANE KARZO. DOMINO PUBLISHING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC. waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (PERRY, MICHEAL)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by MICHAEL COLTUN, SOULEYMANE IBRAHIM, AHMOUDOU MADASSANE, M'DOU MOCTAR, MAHAMADOU SOULEYMANE. (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES on behalf of Defendants MICHAEL COLTUN, SOULEYMANE IBRAHIM, AHMOUDOU MADASSANE, M'DOU MOCTAR, MAHAMADOU SOULEYMANE (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Domino Publishing Company of America, Inc., #2 Summons - Redeye, Inc., #3 Summons - M'Dou Moctar, #4 Summons - Mahamadou Souleymane, #5 Summons - Michael Coltun, #6 Summons - Ahmoudour Madassane, #7 Summons - Souleymane Ibrahim) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/2/2021; that the plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. [28 U.S.C. 1915(a)] Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant, including the correct address and the name and title of the individual to be served on behalf of a corporation, association, infant, incompetent or government agency. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the complaint and summons upon the defendant. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 1, 2021 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #2 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP () by MOHAMED ALASSANE KARZO. (PERRY, MICHEAL)
August 30, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 30, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MOHAMED ALASSANE KARZO. (PERRY, MICHEAL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KARZO v. MATADOR RECORDS, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED ALASSANE KARZO
Represented By: MICHEAL SHANE PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATADOR RECORDS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMINO PUBLISHING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDEYE, INC.
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M'DOU MOCTAR
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAHAMADOU SOULEYMANE
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL COLTUN
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMOUDOU MADASSANE
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBRAHIM SOULEYMANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOULEYMANE IBRAHIM
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?