STARPOINT, INC. v UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA
Plaintiff: STARPOINT, INC. doing business as STARPOINT GLOBAL SERVICES
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER also known as USA HEALTH, USA HEALTH and UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL
Case Number: 1:2021cv00720
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 11/8/21, that Plaintiff's motion for extension, (Doc. #12 ), is GRANTED and that Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 24, 2021, within which to file a response to Defendants' motion to dismiss. Responses due by 11/24/2021. (Butler, Carol) Modified on 11/8/2021 to edit response date. (Butler, Carol)
November 8, 2021 Set Deadlines: Plaintiffs Response due by 11/24/2021. (Butler, Carol)
November 5, 2021 Motion Submitted re: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss, to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (Welch, Kelly)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by STARPOINT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FROST, JOSEPH)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL (O'BRIEN, D.)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL (O'BRIEN, D.)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL filed by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL. (O'BRIEN, D.)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2021 (O'BRIEN, D.)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney D. J. O'BRIEN, III on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL (O'BRIEN, D.)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. (FROST, JOSEPH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STARPOINT, INC.. (FROST, JOSEPH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JOSEPH Z. FROST on behalf of Plaintiff STARPOINT, INC. (FROST, JOSEPH)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Summons - University of South Alabama Children's and Women's Hospital) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 17, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3134386), filed by STARPOINT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2007 Proposal, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2008 Proposal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Business Associate Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Storage Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Unpaid Storage Invoices, #6 Exhibit 6 - USACW Invoice, #7 Exhibit 7 - USAMC Invoice, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2007 Proposal Default Notice, #9 Exhibit 9 0 2008 Proposal Default Notice, #10 Proposed summons, #11 Proposed summons, #12 Proposed summons, #13 Proposed summons) (FROST, JOSEPH)
September 16, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STARPOINT, INC. v UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER also known as USA HEALTH
Represented By: D. J. O'BRIEN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA HEALTH
Represented By: D. J. O'BRIEN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA CHILDREN'S AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: D. J. O'BRIEN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARPOINT, INC. doing business as STARPOINT GLOBAL SERVICES
Represented By: JOSEPH Z. FROST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?