BLEWITT v KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: Jessica M Blewitt and JESSICA MAE BLEWITT
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00736
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to KILOLO KIJAKAZI served on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021. as to (SETZER, KATHRYN)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 9/30/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. as to (SETZER, KATHRYN)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 10/4/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. as to (SETZER, KATHRYN)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Winchester, Robin)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KILOLO KIJAKAZI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons - U.S. Attorney General) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 23, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3138773.), filed by Jessica M Blewitt.(SETZER, KATHRYN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLEWITT v KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica M Blewitt
Represented By: KATHRYN C. SETZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA MAE BLEWITT
Represented By: KATHRYN C. SETZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?