WILLIAMS v. GBR PIZZA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Carvis Williams
Defendant: GBR Pizza, Inc., Gerald B. Rhodes, John Doe, 1-10, Doe Corp., 1-10 and GBR PIZZA, INC. doing business as DOMINO'S
Case Number: 1:2021cv00828
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by GBR PIZZA, INC. and GERALD B. RHODES. For good cause shown, Defendants GBR PIZZA, INC. and GERALD B. RHODES shall have up to and including January 12, 2022 to file an Answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 12/20/2021.(Pender, Rachel)
December 17, 2021 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Engle, Anita)
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GBR PIZZA, INC., GERALD B. RHODES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KORN, MATTHEW)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GBR PIZZA, INC. (GOETZL, LAUREN)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LAUREN G. GOETZL on behalf of Defendants GBR PIZZA, INC., GERALD B. RHODES (GOETZL, LAUREN)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GBR PIZZA, INC., GERALD B. RHODES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KORN, MATTHEW)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for GBR PIZZA, INC. and GERALD B. RHODES. Answer due by 12/22/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/17/2021. (Brubaker, John)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PHILIP J. KRZESKI on behalf of Plaintiff CARVIS WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3172901.) (KRZESKI, PHILIP)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARVIS WILLIAMS as to GBR PIZZA, INC. served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; GERALD B. RHODES served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. on Entity / Individual Gerald B. Rhodes (LEON, MARY ANN)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GBR PIZZA, INC., GERALD B. RHODES. (Attachments: #1 GERALD B. RHODES - Summons) (Carter, Alexus)
October 27, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
October 27, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Carter, Alexus)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corrected CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LEON, MARY ANN)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3160046.), filed by Carvis Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C. Williams Consent to Join FLSA Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LEON, MARY ANN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. GBR PIZZA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carvis Williams
Represented By: MARY ANN LEON
Represented By: PHILIP J. KRZESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GBR Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald B. Rhodes
Represented By: LAUREN G. GOETZL
Represented By: MATTHEW R. KORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corp., 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GBR PIZZA, INC. doing business as DOMINO'S
Represented By: LAUREN G. GOETZL
Represented By: MATTHEW R. KORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?