TAYLOR et al v. CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: JANET TAYLOR and JAMES NEWLANDS
Defendant: CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION and WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00839
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER re: #8 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Enlargement of Word Count and #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. (Daniel, J)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney KENNETH WINN ALLEN on behalf of Defendants CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3195917.) (ALLEN, KENNETH)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JONATHAN E. SCHULZ on behalf of Defendants CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC. (SCHULZ, JONATHAN)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(LAM, CHRISTOPHER)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Enlargement of Word Count by Defendants CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC. filed by CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC.. (LAM, CHRISTOPHER)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Enlargement of Word Count by CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC.. (LAM, CHRISTOPHER)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC.. (LAM, CHRISTOPHER)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendants CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC.. (LAM, CHRISTOPHER)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER CARLISLE LAM on behalf of Defendants CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC. (LAM, CHRISTOPHER)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by JANET TAYLOR, JAMES NEWLANDS. All Defendants. (GEER, MARTHA)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Carter, Alexus)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons - WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC.) (Carter, Alexus)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3162395.), filed by JANET TAYLOR, JAMES NEWLANDS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GEER, MARTHA)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR et al v. CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET TAYLOR
Represented By: MARTHA A. GEER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES NEWLANDS
Represented By: MARTHA A. GEER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION
Represented By: KENNETH WINN ALLEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CARLISLE LAM
Represented By: JONATHAN E. SCHULZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENT, INC.
Represented By: KENNETH WINN ALLEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CARLISLE LAM
Represented By: JONATHAN E. SCHULZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?