PATTERSON et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JUDITH D PATTERSON
Defendant: 3M COMPANY, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, ITT, LLC, VIACOMCBS INC., VISTRA CORP., MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY, COVIL CORPORATION, CRANE CO., CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC., DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, EATON CORPORATION, EMERSON ELECTRIC CO., FLUOR CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED, GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC., GRINNELL LLC doing business as GRINNELL CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., a ITT CORPORATION, ITT INDUSTRIES INC., ITT FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., HOFFMAN SPECIALTY MFG. CORP., BELL AND GOSSETT COMPANY and ITT MARLOW, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PNEUMO ABEX, LLC, RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., RUST INTERNATIONAL INC., SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC., STARR DAVIS COMPANY OF S.C., INC., CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, VIACOM, INC., successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION, a Pennsylvania corporation, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and also as successor-in-interest to BF STURTEVANT, VISTRA ENERGY CORP. individually and as successor-in-interest to CRS SIRRINE, CRSS, as successor-in-interest to J.E. SIRRINE, VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC, WARREN PUMPS, LLC and WIND UP, LTD
Case Number: 1:2021cv00937
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Motions Referred: RE: #62 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
February 3, 2022 Filing 98 REPLY TO RESPONSE re #62 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC. (STARK, KENDRA) Modified on 2/3/2022 to correct event per attorney. (Hicks, Samantha)
January 31, 2022 Filing 97 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 3/2/2022 (Winchester, Robin)
January 20, 2022 Filing 96 NOTICE by JUDITH D PATTERSON re #95 Response in Opposition to Motion, Certificate of Word Count (HUMEN, DAVID)
January 20, 2022 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 Memorandum filed by VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC, #62 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC filed by JUDITH D PATTERSON. Replies due by 2/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(HUMEN, DAVID)
January 13, 2022 Filing 94 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PHILIP C. REID on behalf of Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3210419.) (REID, PHILIP)
January 13, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney RHYAN J. LINDLEY on behalf of Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3210348.) (LINDLEY, RHYAN)
January 12, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 2/23/2022 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
January 6, 2022 Filing 91 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
December 31, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney SCOTT E. FRICK on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3202460.) (FRICK, SCOTT)
December 31, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney W. DAVID CONNER on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3202459.) (CONNER, W.)
December 31, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MOFFATT G. MCDONALD on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3202458.) (MCDONALD, MOFFATT)
December 31, 2021 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
December 31, 2021 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
December 31, 2021 Filing 85 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
December 31, 2021 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
December 31, 2021 Filing 83 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
December 31, 2021 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
December 31, 2021 Filing 81 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
December 30, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney YANCEY A. MCLEOD, III on behalf of Defendant PNEUMO ABEX, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3202364.) (MCLEOD, YANCEY)
December 30, 2021 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant PNEUMO ABEX, LLC by PNEUMO ABEX, LLC.(SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
December 30, 2021 Filing 78 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by PNEUMO ABEX, LLC. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
December 30, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KIMBERLY SULLIVAN on behalf of Defendant PNEUMO ABEX, LLC (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
December 30, 2021 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant STARR DAVIS COMPANY OF S.C., INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
December 30, 2021 Filing 75 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by STARR DAVIS COMPANY OF S.C., INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
December 30, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE by VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC re #63 Memorandum Certificate of Word Count (STARK, KENDRA)
December 30, 2021 Filing 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. by EMERSON ELECTRIC CO..(O'NEILL, M.)
December 30, 2021 Filing 72 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.. (O'NEILL, M.)
December 30, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KIMBERLY SULLIVAN on behalf of Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
December 30, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ROBERT O. MERIWETHER on behalf of Defendant WIND UP, LTD (MERIWETHER, ROBERT)
December 30, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL on behalf of Defendant EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. (O'NEILL, M.)
December 30, 2021 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant WIND UP, LTD. (STARR, WILLIAM)
December 30, 2021 Filing 67 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by WIND UP, LTD. (STARR, WILLIAM)
December 30, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant WIND UP, LTD (STARR, WILLIAM)
December 30, 2021 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by VISTRA CORP.. (STARK, KENDRA)
December 30, 2021 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC. (STARK, KENDRA)
December 30, 2021 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC re #62 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC. (STARK, KENDRA)
December 30, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/20/2022 (STARK, KENDRA)
December 30, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CURTIS J. SHIPLEY on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (SHIPLEY, CURTIS)
December 30, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SCOTTIE F. LEE on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (LEE, SCOTTIE)
December 30, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (PACKER, LESLIE)
December 30, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
December 30, 2021 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
December 30, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
December 30, 2021 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.. (SAULS, ERIC)
December 30, 2021 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. (SAULS, ERIC)
December 30, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ERIC G. SAULS on behalf of Defendant GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. (SAULS, ERIC)
December 29, 2021 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
December 29, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
December 29, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant ITT, LLC (STARR, WILLIAM)
December 29, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL LLC (STARR, WILLIAM)
December 29, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED (STARR, WILLIAM)
December 29, 2021 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant ITT, LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
December 29, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ITT, LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
December 29, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant ITT, LLC (TOMLIN, TRACY)
December 29, 2021 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant GRINNELL LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
December 29, 2021 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GRINNELL LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
December 29, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL LLC (TOMLIN, TRACY)
December 29, 2021 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
December 29, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
December 29, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED (TOMLIN, TRACY)
December 29, 2021 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant VIACOMCBS INC.. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
December 29, 2021 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
December 29, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by VIACOMCBS INC.. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
December 29, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
December 28, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by EATON CORPORATION. (MALIK, GEORGIA)
December 28, 2021 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant EATON CORPORATION. (MALIK, GEORGIA)
December 28, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney GEORGIA H. MALIK on behalf of Defendant EATON CORPORATION (MALIK, GEORGIA)
December 28, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney RICHARD T. BOYETTE on behalf of Defendant EATON CORPORATION (BOYETTE, RICHARD)
December 28, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney GINA M. VON OEHSEN CLEARY on behalf of Defendant EATON CORPORATION (VON OEHSEN CLEARY, GINA)
December 28, 2021 Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
December 27, 2021 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant WARREN PUMPS, LLC by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.(BENNETT, JOSHUA)
December 27, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
December 23, 2021 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant 3M COMPANY by 3M COMPANY.(SCHULZ, JONATHAN)
December 23, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 3M COMPANY. (SCHULZ, JONATHAN)
December 23, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JONATHAN E. SCHULZ on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY (SCHULZ, JONATHAN)
December 22, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.. (MATHER, EMILY)
December 22, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.. (MATHER, EMILY)
December 22, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY)
December 22, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY)
December 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney EMILY K. MATHER on behalf of Defendants CRANE CO., CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. (MATHER, EMILY)
December 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MARLA T. RESCHLY on behalf of Defendants CRANE CO., CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. (RESCHLY, MARLA)
December 22, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(BENNETT, JOSHUA)
December 22, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
December 21, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant RUST INTERNATIONAL INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by RUST INTERNATIONAL INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PAUL S. GUERRIERE on behalf of Defendants VISTRA CORP., VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3198077.) (GUERRIERE, PAUL)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC. (STARK, KENDRA)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VISTRA CORP.. (STARK, KENDRA)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KENDRA N. STARK on behalf of Defendants VISTRA CORP., VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC (STARK, KENDRA)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KEITH E. COLTRAIN on behalf of Defendant METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
December 9, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Carter, Alexus)
December 9, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Carter, Alexus)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JESSICA M. DEAN on behalf of Plaintiff JUDITH D PATTERSON ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3188631.) (DEAN, JESSICA)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney DAVID C. HUMEN on behalf of Plaintiff JUDITH D PATTERSON ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3188628.) (HUMEN, DAVID)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Carter, Alexus)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3188229.), filed by JOHN K. PATTERSON, JUDITH D PATTERSON.(GRAHAM, WILLIAM)
December 8, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: JONATHAN E. SCHULZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT, LLC
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOMCBS INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISTRA CORP.
Represented By: KENDRA N. STARK
Represented By: PAUL S. GUERRIERE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: JONATHAN E. SCHULZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVIL CORPORATION
Represented By: ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE
Represented By: CURTIS J. SHIPLEY
Represented By: LESLIE C. PACKER
Represented By: SCOTTIE F. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: EMILY K. MATHER
Represented By: MARLA T. RESCHLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.
Represented By: EMILY K. MATHER
Represented By: MARLA T. RESCHLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: GEORGIA H. MALIK
Represented By: GINA M. VON OEHSEN CLEARY
Represented By: RICHARD T. BOYETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Represented By: KIMBERLY SULLIVAN
Represented By: PHILIP C. REID
Represented By: RHYAN J. LINDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: ERIC G. SAULS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC doing business as GRINNELL CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: a ITT CORPORATION, ITT INDUSTRIES INC., ITT FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., HOFFMAN SPECIALTY MFG. CORP., BELL AND GOSSETT COMPANY and ITT MARLOW
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KEITH E. COLTRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX, LLC
Represented By: KIMBERLY SULLIVAN
Represented By: YANCEY A. MCLEOD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUST INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARR DAVIS COMPANY OF S.C., INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC., successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION, a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and also as successor-in-interest to BF STURTEVANT
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISTRA ENERGY CORP. individually and as successor-in-interest to CRS SIRRINE
Represented By: KENDRA N. STARK
Represented By: PAUL S. GUERRIERE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRSS, as successor-in-interest to J.E. SIRRINE
Represented By: KENDRA N. STARK
Represented By: PAUL S. GUERRIERE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISTRA INTERMEDIATE COMPANY LLC
Represented By: KENDRA N. STARK
Represented By: PAUL S. GUERRIERE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIND UP, LTD
Represented By: ROBERT O. MERIWETHER
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH D PATTERSON
Represented By: DAVID C. HUMEN
Represented By: JESSICA M. DEAN
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?