STREET v. SANTIAGO et al
Plaintiff: LOMMIA FAYE STREET
Defendant: JOHN SANTIAGO, TRAVIS J NELLIS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and TRAVIS J. NELLIS
Case Number: 1:2021cv00941
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to Dept of Veterans Affairs served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. (MCDONALD, DAVID)
January 12, 2022 Answer updated for All Defendants to 3/6/2022. (Daniel, J)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney NATHAN L. STRUP on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (STRUP, NATHAN)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOMMIA FAYE STREET as to on Certified mail, return receipt requested John Santiago (MCDONALD, DAVID)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to JOHN SANTIAGO served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (MCDONALD, DAVID)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOMMIA FAYE STREET. on Certified mail, return receipt requested as to Sandra Hairston, Esq. (MCDONALD, DAVID)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOMMIA FAYE STREET as to on certified mail, return receipt requested travis j. nellis (MCDONALD, DAVID)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to TRAVIS J. NELLIS served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (MCDONALD, DAVID)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to (MCDONALD, DAVID)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (MCDONALD, DAVID)
December 10, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Carter, Alexus)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Manual Filing video files (Exhibit 3 to #1 Complaint) in disc form with the Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Cover of Disc) (Hicks, Samantha)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Travis J Nellis, #2 Summons - U.S. Attorney) (Carter, Alexus)
December 9, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3188748.)(Related Case # MC51/7648426, MC51/7648427), filed by LOMMIA FAYE STREET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Administrative Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 Acknowledgment of receipt, #3 Exhibit 3 Video Recordings) (MCDONALD, DAVID) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/8/2021 to correct PDF document.) (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STREET v. SANTIAGO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOMMIA FAYE STREET
Represented By: DAVID W. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS J NELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: NATHAN L. STRUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS J. NELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?