JORDAN et al v. CHATHAM COUNTY SCHOOLS et al
Plaintiff: SUSIE JORDAN
Defendant: CHATHAM COUNTY SCHOOLS, DAN BARNWELL, G. DOE, M. DOE, GYM TEACHER DOE A, GYM TEACHER DOE B and DOES 1 THROUGH 20
Case Number: 1:2022cv00012
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12112 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 2/4/2022; that this action is STAYED for sixty (60) days to allow Plaintiff the opportunity to retain counsel, since she cannot proceed pro se in federal court representing the interests of her children. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 2, 2022 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE re: #3 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem. (Daniel, J)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CHATHAM COUNTY SCHOOLS and DAN BARNWELL. (Carter, Alexus)
January 11, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Carter, Alexus)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint ad Litem by SUSIE JORDAN (Individually). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Carter, Alexus)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Carter, Alexus)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SUSIE JORDAN (as Parent and Guardian Ad Litem of A.E.J. (a minor) and B.A.J. (a minor), and SUSIE JORDAN (Individually). (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JORDAN et al v. CHATHAM COUNTY SCHOOLS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSIE JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHATHAM COUNTY SCHOOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN BARNWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GYM TEACHER DOE A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GYM TEACHER DOE B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?