HILL v. CARVANA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ARTHUR HILL
Defendant: CARVANA, LLC and Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00037
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Manual Filing CD Exhibits 18 and 19. Re #19 Declaration, Exb 7- Exhibit 18; Exb 8-Exhibit 19. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION re #17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff ARTHUR HILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19)(Taylor, Abby)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM re #17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff ARTHUR HILL. (Taylor, Abby)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by ARTHUR HILL. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope)(Taylor, Abby)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Submitted: #10 MOTION to Dismiss to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Winchester, Robin)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Defendants BRIDGECREST CREDIT COMPANY, LLC, CARVANA, LLC, to Response to #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BRIDGECREST CREDIT COMPANY, LLC, CARVANA, LLC. (CROOMS-CARPENTER, ASHIA)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff ARTHUR HILL re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Sheets, Jamie)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BRIDGECREST CREDIT COMPANY, LLC, CARVANA, LLC, filed by ARTHUR HILL. Replies due by 3/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Sheets, Jamie)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Roseboro Letter as to Plaintiff ARTHUR HILL. Re #10 MOTION to Dismiss by BRIDGECREST CREDIT COMPANY, LLC, CARVANA, LLC. (Taylor, Abby)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Winchester, Robin)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BRIDGECREST CREDIT COMPANY, LLC, CARVANA, LLC. Replies due by 2/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Memo ISO MTD, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to Memo ISO MTD)(CROOMS-CARPENTER, ASHIA) Modified on 2/3/2022 to correct title of document (Winchester, Robin).
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by BRIDGECREST CREDIT COMPANY, LLC, CARVANA, LLC. Response to Motion due by 2/23/2022 (CROOMS-CARPENTER, ASHIA)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF SELECTION OF MEDIATOR. (CROOMS-CARPENTER, ASHIA)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant BRIDGECREST CREDIT COMPANY, LLC, CARVANA, LLC, filed by ARTHUR HILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Signed Pro Se Electronic Service Consent by ARTHUR HILL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, Case Number 21-CVS-3755, issued 10/28/2021, and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal.) (Carter, Alexus)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ARTHUR HILL. (Original filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, Case Number 21-CVS-3755, and listed as Exhibit 2 to the Petition for Removal.) (Carter, Alexus)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation for Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC.. (CROOMS-CARPENTER, ASHIA)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants CARVANA, LLC, Carvana Group, LLC, Carvana Co. Sub LLC, Carvana Co. identifying Corporate Parent Carvana Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Carvana Co. Sub LLC, Corporate Parent Carvana Co. for CARVANA, LLC.. (CROOMS-CARPENTER, ASHIA)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against ARTHUR HILL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3214963.), filed by CARVANA, LLC, Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Exhibit State Court 1st Amended Complaint)(CROOMS-CARPENTER, ASHIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. CARVANA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARVANA, LLC
Represented By: ASHIA BRE'ANA CROOMS-CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC
Represented By: ASHIA BRE'ANA CROOMS-CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?