LIGHT v. POLLOCK et al
Plaintiff: JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT and ESTATE OF JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT
Defendant: MARCUS POLLOCK, JEFF PRITCHARD and CITY OF GRAHAM
Case Number: 1:2022cv00059
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend Complaint by JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT. Response to Motion due by 4/7/2022 (GREEN, C.) Modified on 3/17/2022 to mark as filed in error and remove from docket. Party was instructed per #12 Order to file amended complaint and have done so at #13 . (Hicks, Samantha)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. UNASSIGNED no longer assigned to the case as presider. See #14 Order of Reference. (Williamson, Wanda)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Selection of Mediator due by 4/7/2022. Mediation due by 12/15/2022. (Bond, Melisa)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE no longer assigned to case as referral judge. (Williamson, Wanda)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to United States Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake to conduct all proceedings including a jury or nonjury trial, to order the entry of judgment, and to conduct all post-judgment proceedings therein. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 3/16/2022. (Hicks, Samantha)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT, filed by JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT.(GREEN, C.) Modified on 3/17/2022 to remove filed in error. See #12 Order. (Hicks, Samantha)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED RE: Order of Reference to the USMJ, to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER (Williamson, Wanda)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 3/15/2022; that the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report [Doc. #10 ] and Joint Local Rule 5.5 Report [Doc. #11 ] are approved as submitted and as noted herein. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is given thirty days, until April 14, 2022, to file an Amended Complaint as appropriate under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 17(a). Discovery is exceptional. Discovery due by 12/15/2022. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2022. Defendants' Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2022. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 8/1/2022. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 9/1/2022. The parties have agreed to consent to jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately 5 days. A jury trial has been demanded. (Hicks, Samantha)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #11 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties, #10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties by JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT.(GREEN, C.)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT.(GREEN, C.) Modified on 3/11/2022 requested amended report with the L.R. 5.5 requirements(Garrett, Kim).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 4/4/2022 (Winchester, Robin)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 3/24/2022 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CITY OF GRAHAM, MARCUS POLLOCK, JEFF PRITCHARD. (MACLATCHIE, SCOTT)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CITY OF GRAHAM served on 2/1/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (GREEN, C.)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to JEFF PRITCHARD served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (GREEN, C.)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to MARCUS POLLOCK served on 1/31/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (GREEN, C.)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Carter, Alexus)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Carter, Alexus)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - JEFF PRITCHARD, #2 Summons - CITY OF GRAHAM) (Carter, Alexus)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3220439.), filed by JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT.(GREEN, C.)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIGHT v. POLLOCK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT
Represented By: C. DOUGLAS GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JAQUYN O'NEILL LIGHT
Represented By: C. DOUGLAS GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCUS POLLOCK
Represented By: SCOTT D. MACLATCHIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF PRITCHARD
Represented By: SCOTT D. MACLATCHIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF GRAHAM
Represented By: SCOTT D. MACLATCHIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?