CLARK-PARKER v. ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM et al
Plaintiff: REGINA CLARK-PARKER
Defendant: ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, ROWAN-SALISBURY BOARD OF EDUCATION, KEVIN JONES, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, TRAVIS ALLEN, SUSAN COX, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, DEAN HUNTER, JEAN KENNEDY and TONY WATLINGTON
Case Number: 1:2022cv00249
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties by TRAVIS ALLEN, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, SUSAN COX, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, DEAN HUNTER, KEVIN JONES, JEAN KENNEDY, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, TONY WATLINGTON.(MCDANIEL, KAYLA)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by TRAVIS ALLEN, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, SUSAN COX, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, DEAN HUNTER, KEVIN JONES, JEAN KENNEDY, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, TONY WATLINGTON.(MCDANIEL, KAYLA) Modified on 5/12/2022 requested amended report with dates certain (Garrett, Kim).
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Submitted: #42 MOTION to Dismiss to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES- (Winchester, Robin)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY, filed by Defendants TRAVIS ALLEN, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, SUSAN COX, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, DEAN HUNTER, KEVIN JONES, JEAN KENNEDY, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, TONY WATLINGTON, to Response to #42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TRAVIS ALLEN, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, SUSAN COX, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, DEAN HUNTER, KEVIN JONES, JEAN KENNEDY, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, TONY WATLINGTON. (MCDANIEL, KAYLA)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL on behalf of Defendants TRAVIS ALLEN, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, SUSAN COX, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, DEAN HUNTER, KEVIN JONES, JEAN KENNEDY, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, TONY WATLINGTON (MCDANIEL, KAYLA)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JEAN KENNEDY, KEVIN JONES, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, DEAN HUNTER, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, TONY WATLINGTON, TRAVIS ALLEN, SUSAN COX filed by REGINA CLARK-PARKER. Replies due by 5/10/2022. (Hicks, Samantha)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 5/19/2022 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Kemp, Donita)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond re #42 Motion to Dismiss. (Hicks, Samantha)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants TRAVIS ALLEN, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, SUSAN COX, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, DEAN HUNTER, KEVIN JONES, JEAN KENNEDY, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, TONY WATLINGTON re #42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TRAVIS ALLEN, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, SUSAN COX, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, DEAN HUNTER, KEVIN JONES, JEAN KENNEDY, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, TONY WATLINGTON. (BOLICK, RYAN)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss by TRAVIS ALLEN, ALISHA BYRD-CLARK, SUSAN COX, BRIAN HIGHTOWER, DEAN HUNTER, KEVIN JONES, JEAN KENNEDY, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, TONY WATLINGTON. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2022 (BOLICK, RYAN)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES.(Winchester, Robin)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00249. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying as moot #18 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #20 Motion to Change Venue; denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/23/22. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Clark-Parker. Alisha Byrd-Clark served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Ryan D. Bolick on behalf of Travis Allen, Tony Watlington, Susan Cox, Dean Hunter, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Brian Hightower, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Attorney Virginia Marie Wooten terminated. (Bolick, Ryan) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Pro Se SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Clark-Parker. Kevin Jones served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgr) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Pro Se SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Clark-Parker. Rowan-Salisbury School System served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgr) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Pro Se SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Clark-Parker. Susan Cox served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgr) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Change Venue by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington. (Wooten, Virginia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington. (Wooten, Virginia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Pro Se RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Regina Clark-Parker. Replies due by 9/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Pro Se RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Change Venue by Regina Clark-Parker. Replies due by 9/7/2021 (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DELETED DOCUMENT, docketed in error. Modified on 8/26/2021 (eef). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Pro Se SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Clark-Parker. Kevin Jones served on 8/21/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Pro Se SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Clark-Parker. Dean Hunter served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Pro Se SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Clark-Parker. Travis Allen served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Pro Se SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Clark-Parker. Jean Kennedy served on 8/21/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Pro Se SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Clark-Parker. Brian Hightower served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Summons Reissued Conventionally as to Kevin Jones, Rowan-Salisbury School System. (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington.(Wooten, Virginia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Change Venue by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington. (Wooten, Virginia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Change Venue by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington. Responses due by 8/31/2021 (Wooten, Virginia). Modified to remove referral on 2/9/2022 (mga). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Order Granting MTD, #4 Exhibit D - Employment Contract)(Wooten, Virginia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington. Responses due by 8/31/2021 (Wooten, Virginia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Pro Se Opt In of PSAP Program by Regina Clark-Parker (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Tony Watlington. (tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Virginia Marie Wooten on behalf of Travis Allen, Tony Watlington, Susan Cox, Dean Hunter, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Brian Hightower, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Attorney Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton terminated. (Wooten, Virginia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Pro Se RESPONSE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Regina Clark-Parker. (tlj) Modified to correct link on 8/13/2021 (clc). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Amended Complaint. Travis Allen answer due 8/17/2021; Alisha Byrd-Clark answer due 8/17/2021; Susan Cox answer due 8/17/2021; Brian Hightower answer due 8/17/2021; Dean Hunter answer due 8/17/2021; Kevin Jones answer due 8/17/2021; Jean Kennedy answer due 8/17/2021; Rowan-Salisbury School System answer due 8/17/2021; Tony Watlington answer due 8/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/26/21. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington. (Hamilton, Meredith). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Regina Clark-Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(tlj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 7/27/2021. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/8/21. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PSAP Opt In/Out Form mailed to Pro Se Litigant. PSAP Response due by 7/16/2021 (clc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting with modification #7 Pro Se Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 7/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/2/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Regina Clark-Parker. Responses due by 7/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (dgr). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal,, by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury Board of Education, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington.(Hamilton, Meredith) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury Board of Education, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Action Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Action Order Granting Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Employment Contract)(Hamilton, Meredith) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Rowan-Salisbury Board of Education, Rowan-Salisbury School System, Tony Watlington. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Hamilton, Meredith) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal. Travis Allen answer due 6/22/2021; Alisha Byrd-Clark answer due 6/22/2021; Susan Cox answer due 6/22/2021; Brian Hightower answer due 6/22/2021; Dean Hunter answer due 6/22/2021; Kevin Jones answer due 6/22/2021; Jean Kennedy answer due 6/22/2021; Rowan-Salisbury Board of Education answer due 6/22/2021; Rowan-Salisbury School System answer due 6/22/2021; Tony Watlington answer due 6/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/28/21. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond by Travis Allen, Alisha Byrd-Clark, Susan Cox, Brian Hightower, Dean Hunter, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, ROWAN-SALISBURY BOARD OF EDUCATION, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, Tony Watlington. (Hamilton, Meredith) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from North Carolina Superior Court for Mecklenburg County, case number 21 CVS 5010. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5049797), filed by Travis Allen, Tony Watlington, ROWAN-SALISBURY BOARD OF EDUCATION, Susan Cox, Dean Hunter, ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM, Brian Hightower, Kevin Jones, Jean Kennedy, Alisha Byrd-Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal (to state court))(Hamilton, Meredith) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (dgr) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David Keesler: #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(dgr) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 3/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK-PARKER v. ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROWAN-SALISBURY SCHOOL SYSTEM
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROWAN-SALISBURY BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN JONES
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISHA BYRD-CLARK
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS ALLEN
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN COX
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN HIGHTOWER
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEAN HUNTER
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEAN KENNEDY
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY WATLINGTON
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN D. BOLICK
Represented By: VIRGINIA M WOOTEN
Represented By: KAYLA NICOLE MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINA CLARK-PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?