HARTGROVE v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE TANNEAL HARTGROVE
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. and TRANS UNION, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00354
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (ENLOE, CAREN)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. Answer due by 7/5/2022. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 6/14/2022. (Brubaker, John)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., EXPERIAN PLC identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC... (ENLOE, CAREN)
June 13, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ENLOE, CAREN)
June 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CAREN D. ENLOE on behalf of Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (ENLOE, CAREN)
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TRANS UNION, LLC. (DUNN, CHRISTY)
June 9, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants TRANS UNION, LLC, TRANSUNION INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC., TRANSUNION identifying Corporate Parent TRANSUNION, Corporate Parent TRANSUNION INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC. for TRANS UNION, LLC.. (DUNN, CHRISTY)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTY C. DUNN on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC (DUNN, CHRISTY)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ROBERT COWAN DEROSSET, IV on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC (DEROSSET, ROBERT)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EQUIFAX INC. identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC. for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.. (GOEMANN, ETHAN)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOEMANN, ETHAN)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Answer due by 7/11/2022. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 6/3/2022 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney SYLVIA BOLOS on behalf of Plaintiff STEPHANIE TANNEAL HARTGROVE ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3301791.) (BOLOS, SYLVIA)
May 13, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
May 13, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., #2 Summons - TRANS UNION, LLC) (Carter, Alexus)
May 13, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Carter, Alexus)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ASA C. EDWARDS, IV on behalf of Plaintiff STEPHANIE TANNEAL HARTGROVE (EDWARDS, ASA)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3294120.), filed by STEPHANIE TANNEAL HARTGROVE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(EDWARDS, ASA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARTGROVE v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE TANNEAL HARTGROVE
Represented By: ASA C. EDWARDS, IV
Represented By: SYLVIA BOLOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: ETHAN C. GOEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: CAREN D. ENLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTY C. DUNN
Represented By: ROBERT COWAN DEROSSET, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?