ATKINSON v. CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: LESLIE ATKINSON
Defendant: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., CAROLINA REPO, LLC, BRENT GODFREY, WAYNE COATS and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2022cv00369
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE by LESLIE ATKINSON re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (BROWN, CHRIS)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by LESLIE ATKINSON re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (THOMPSON, RUSSELL) Modified on 7/7/2022 to mark filed in error. Attorney to re-file under correct login credentials. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JONATHAN T. DICKERSON on behalf of Defendant CAROLINA REPO, LLC (DICKERSON, JONATHAN)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CAROLINA REPO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(WHITE, JAMES)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JAMES C. WHITE on behalf of Defendant CAROLINA REPO, LLC (WHITE, JAMES)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CAROLINA REPO, LLC. Answer due by 8/8/2022. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 7/6/2022. (Brubaker, John)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Dismiss/Compel Arbitration by LESLIE ATKINSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BROWN, CHRIS)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney RUSSELL S. THOMPSON, IV on behalf of Plaintiff LESLIE ATKINSON ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3326183.) (THOMPSON, RUSSELL)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 BRIEF re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) by Defendants WAYNE COATS, BRENT GODFREY filed by WAYNE COATS, BRENT GODFREY. (CASTRO, BRIAN)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by WAYNE COATS, BRENT GODFREY. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2022 (CASTRO, BRIAN)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney BRIAN F. CASTRO on behalf of Defendants WAYNE COATS, BRENT GODFREY (CASTRO, BRIAN)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Answer due by 7/18/2022. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 6/17/2022. (Brubaker, John)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(MOORE, JACKSON)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., PFS Group, Inc., PFS Investors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PFS Group, Inc., Corporate Parent PFS Investors, LLC for PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC... (MOORE, JACKSON)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JACKSON WYATT MOORE, JR on behalf of Defendant PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (MOORE, JACKSON)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kelly Namel, #2 Exhibit Order, Taylor v. JD Motors, LLC)(MCGEE, THOMAS)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 7/7/2022 (MCGEE, THOMAS)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (MCGEE, THOMAS)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LESLIE ATKINSON as to CAROLINA REPO, LLC served on 6/16/2022, answer due 7/7/2022. (BROWN, CHRIS)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to CAROLINA REPO, LLC. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Summons as to WAYNE COATS served on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022. (BROWN, CHRIS)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Summons as to BRENT GODFREY served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. (BROWN, CHRIS)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Summons as to PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. served on 5/25/2022, answer due 6/15/2022. (BROWN, CHRIS)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Service as to CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION served on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022. (BROWN, CHRIS)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., CAROLINA REPO, LLC, BRENT GODFREY, WAYNE COATS. (Attachments: #1 Summons - PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., #2 Summons - CAROLINA REPO, LLC, #3 Summons - BRENT GODFREY, #4 Summons - WAYNE COATS) (Carter, Alexus)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAROLINA REPO, LLC, WAYNE COATS, CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, JOHN DOE, BRENT GODFREY, PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3297509.), filed by LESLIE ATKINSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BROWN, CHRIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATKINSON v. CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE ATKINSON
Represented By: CHRIS J. BROWN
Represented By: RUSSELL S. THOMPSON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS WILLIAM MCGEE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JACKSON WYATT MOORE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA REPO, LLC
Represented By: JAMES C. WHITE
Represented By: JONATHAN T. DICKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT GODFREY
Represented By: BRIAN F. CASTRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE COATS
Represented By: BRIAN F. CASTRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?