GRAHAM v. ALBRO
Plaintiff: JACK H. GRAHAM, III doing business as KATHYE'S JEWELRY AND PAWN SHOP
Defendant: STEVE ALBRO
Case Number: 1:2022cv00708
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 10/03/2022, that Plaintiff's Withdrawal of Motion, (Doc. #5 ), is GRANTED, and that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, (Doc. #3 ) filed on September 16, 2022 is hereby DENIED as moot. (Taylor, Abby)
September 22, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT on Certified Mail Receipt as to All Defendants. on Certified Mail Receipt as to Merrick Garland (WILSON, JAMES)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to JACK H. GRAHAM, III served on 9/9/2022, answer due 11/8/2022. as to (WILSON, JAMES)
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail Receipt as to All Defendants. (WILSON, JAMES)
September 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw Document #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JACK H. GRAHAM, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(WILSON, JAMES)
September 19, 2022 Motion Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Daniel, J)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction . (WILSON, JAMES) Modified on 9/19/2022 to and additional language as reflected in the filing. (Powell, Gloria).
September 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by JACK H. GRAHAM, III. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2022 (WILSON, JAMES) Modified on 9/19/2022 to include "and Preliminary Injunction." (Powell, Gloria).
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to STEVE ALBRO, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons - Attorney General) (Carter, Alexus)
August 29, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
August 29, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Carter, Alexus)
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (PETITION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW) against STEVE ALBRO ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3369070.), filed by JACK D GRAHAM. (WILSON, JAMES) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/26/2022 to correct filing error.) (Carter, Alexus). Modified on 8/26/2022 to include full title of document. (Carter, Alexus).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM v. ALBRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK H. GRAHAM, III doing business as KATHYE'S JEWELRY AND PAWN SHOP
Represented By: JAMES BARRETT WILSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE ALBRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?