NAUGLE et al v. META PLATFORMS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KIM NAUGLE and AFRIKA WILLIAMS
Defendant: META PLATFORMS, INC., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. and WAKEMED
Case Number: 1:2022cv00727
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2510 Wire and Electronics Communications Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, (Daniel, J)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (Daniel, J)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (Daniel, J)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY in Support re #48 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. (ANDERSON, MARK) Modified on 10/2/2023 to correct title of document and delete reply deadline. (Taylor, Abby).
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 Memorandum filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., #48 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. filed by AFRIKA WILLIAMS. Replies due by 10/2/2023 (HARRELL, JAMES)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. re #48 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (ANDERSON, MARK)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. Response to Motion due by 9/18/2023 (ANDERSON, MARK)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 07/31/2023, that Defendant Duke University Health System Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, (Doc. #19 ), is DENIED AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Defendant filing a new motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, if warranted. (Taylor, Abby)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., filed by AFRIKA WILLIAMS.(HARRELL, JAMES)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 06/28/2023, that, in light of Plaintiff Naugle's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of WakeMed [Doc. #44 ], Defendant WakeMed's Motion to Sever and Transfer [Doc. #21 ] and Defendant WakeMed's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint [Doc. #23 ] are terminated as MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs have thirty (30) days, until July 28, 2023, to file an Amended Complaint that includes only the claims and parties remaining, so that the Court and remaining Defendant have a clear and plain statement of the claims that Plaintiffs still intend to assert in this action. The filing of an Amended Complaint will render moot the remaining pending Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #19 ], and that Motion can be re-filed as appropriate within thirty (30) days of the filing of the Amended Complaint, with further briefing as provided in Local Rule 7.3. (Taylor, Abby)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Amended Complaint Deadline: Amended Complaint due by 7/28/2023. (Taylor, Abby)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) KIM NAUGLE (On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated) and WAKEMED, filed by Plaintiff KIM NAUGLE (BAXTER-KAUF, KATE)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE re #42 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority filed by WAKEMED. Replies due by 2/17/2023 (MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority by Plaintiffs KIM NAUGLE, AFRIKA WILLIAMS. (BAXTER-KAUF, KATE)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. UNASSIGNED no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PETER H. BURKE on behalf of Plaintiffs KIM NAUGLE, AFRIKA WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3464599.) (BURKE, PETER)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney KAREN HANSON RIEBEL on behalf of Plaintiffs KIM NAUGLE, AFRIKA WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3460727.) (RIEBEL, KAREN)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/28/2022, that the Joint Motion to Transfer and Sever [Doc. #16 is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' claims against Meta-Counts One, Two, Three, Four,Five, Six, and Seven in the Complaint [Doc. #1 -are hereby severed and transferred to the Northern District of California for coordination with In re Meta Pixel Healthcare Litigation, Case No. 3 :22-cv-03580-WHO. Plaintiffs' remaining claims against Duke University Health System, Inc. and WakeMed are not transferred by this Order.(Taylor, Abby)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) Response due 1/17/2023(Winchester, Robin)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PAUL G KARLSGODT on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3450264.) (KARLSGODT, PAUL)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY, filed by Defendant WAKEMED, to Response to #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by WAKEMED. (MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY, filed by Defendant WAKEMED, to Response to #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer filed by WAKEMED. (MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY, filed by Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., to Response to #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (SCULLY, ELIZABETH)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ***Filed in Error*** REPLY, filed by Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., to Response to #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (SCULLY, ELIZABETH) Modified on 12/13/2022 to mark filed in error. Attorney to refile. (Bowers, Alexis)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MAUREEN KANE BERG on behalf of Plaintiffs KIM NAUGLE, AFRIKA WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3445421.) (BERG, MAUREEN)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney KATE M. BAXTER-KAUF on behalf of Plaintiffs KIM NAUGLE, AFRIKA WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3445410.) (BAXTER-KAUF, KATE)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/07/2022, granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. Meta shall have up to and including 30 days after the Court rules on the Joint Motion to Sever and Transfer Claims Against Meta Platforms, Inc. to the Northern District of California, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. (Taylor, Abby)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDMAN, LAUREN)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer filed by WAKEMED filed by KIM NAUGLE, AFRIKA WILLIAMS. Replies due by 12/13/2022 (HARRELL, JAMES)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by WAKEMED filed by KIM NAUGLE, AFRIKA WILLIAMS. Replies due by 12/13/2022 (HARRELL, JAMES)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH ANNE SCULLY on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3431365.) (SCULLY, ELIZABETH)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant WAKEMED re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by WAKEMED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Privacy Practices)(MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by WAKEMED. Response to Motion due by 11/29/2022 (MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant WAKEMED re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer filed by WAKEMED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Matthiae Complaint, Case No. 5:22cv00433 (E.D.N.C.))(MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer by WAKEMED. Response to Motion due by 11/29/2022 (MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (ANDERSON, MARK)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. Response to Motion due by 11/29/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ANDERSON, MARK)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by WAKEMED. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. Answer due 12/8/2022. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 11/4/2022 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDMAN, LAUREN)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted: #16 Joint MOTION to Sever and Transfer Plaintiffs' Claims Against Meta Platforms, Inc. to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (Marsh, Keah)
October 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Sever and Transfer Plaintiffs' Claims Against Meta Platforms, Inc. by META PLATFORMS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 11/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in support of Joint Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion)(GOLDMAN, LAUREN)
October 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney TRENTON JAMES VAN OSS on behalf of Defendant META PLATFORMS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3409922.) (VAN OSS, TRENTON)
October 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney LAUREN R. GOLDMAN on behalf of Defendant META PLATFORMS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3409921.) (GOLDMAN, LAUREN)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MARTENS, MATTHEW)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MATTHEW T. MARTENS on behalf of Defendant META PLATFORMS, INC. (MARTENS, MATTHEW)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (ANDERSON, MARK)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant WAKEMED. (MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/03/2022, granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by WAKEMED to 11/8/2022. Answer due by 11/8/2022. (Taylor, Abby)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/03/2022, granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. to 11/8/2022. Answer due by 11/8/2022. (Taylor, Abby)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by WAKEMED. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCGUIRE, MATTHEW) Modified on 9/29/2022 requested proposed order (Garrett, Kim).
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MATTHEW PATRICK MCGUIRE on behalf of Defendant WAKEMED (MCGUIRE, MATTHEW)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ANDERSON, MARK) Modified on 9/29/2022 requested proposed order (Garrett, Kim).
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MARK E. ANDERSON on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. (ANDERSON, MARK)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KIM NAUGLE, AFRIKA WILLIAMS. META PLATFORMS, INC. waiver sent on 9/9/2022, answer due 11/8/2022. (HARRELL, JAMES)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., #2 Summons - WAKEMED) (Carter, Alexus)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3372762.), filed by KIM NAUGLE, AFRIKA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HARRELL, JAMES) Modified on 9/1/2022 to add complete title of document. (Carter, Alexus).
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Carter, Alexus)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAUGLE et al v. META PLATFORMS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM NAUGLE
Represented By: JAMES RAY HARRELL
Represented By: KATE M. BAXTER-KAUF
Represented By: MAUREEN KANE BERG
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: PETER H. BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFRIKA WILLIAMS
Represented By: JAMES RAY HARRELL
Represented By: KATE M. BAXTER-KAUF
Represented By: MAUREEN KANE BERG
Represented By: KAREN HANSON RIEBEL
Represented By: PETER H. BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: META PLATFORMS, INC.
Represented By: LAUREN R. GOLDMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW T. MARTENS
Represented By: TRENTON JAMES VAN OSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: MARK E. ANDERSON
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANNE SCULLY
Represented By: PAUL G KARLSGODT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKEMED
Represented By: MATTHEW PATRICK MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?