NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., MIDEA AMERICA CORP., MIDEA (U.S.A.), INC. and GD MIDEA AIR CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00861
Filed: October 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., Corporate Parent AB ELECTROLUX for ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC... (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM)
December 7, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM)
December 7, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM W. SILVERMAN on behalf of Defendant ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party - Defendant Electrolux North America, Inc. - by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (RENEGAR, ZACHARY)
November 23, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Midea Group Co., Ltd. for MIDEA AMERICA CORP... (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM)
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Midea Group Co., Ltd. for MIDEA (U.S.A.), INC... (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM)
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MIDEA AMERICA CORP.. (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM)
November 23, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MIDEA (U.S.A.), INC.. (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM)
November 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM W. SILVERMAN on behalf of Defendants MIDEA (U.S.A.), INC., MIDEA AMERICA CORP. (SILVERMAN, WILLIAM)
October 12, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., #2 Summons - MIDEA AMERICA CORP., #3 Summons - MIDEA (U.S.A.), INC., #4 Summons - GD MIDEA AIR CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD.) (Carter, Alexus)
October 12, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Carter, Alexus)
October 12, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
October 12, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Carter, Alexus)
October 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ZACHARY VAN RENEGAR on behalf of Plaintiff NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (RENEGAR, ZACHARY)
October 10, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (RENEGAR, ZACHARY) Modified on 10/11/2022 to remove unnecessary text. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3400684.), filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RENEGAR, ZACHARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ZACHARY VAN RENEGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM W. SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA AMERICA CORP.
Represented By: WILLIAM W. SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA (U.S.A.), INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM W. SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GD MIDEA AIR CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?