CAMPBELL v. DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SHERRY CAMPBELL
Defendant: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL
Special Master: SPECIAL MASTER
Case Number: 1:2022cv01148
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 02/10/2023, that the Defendants' Motion to Extend Word Limits for Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine is GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to 14,000 words for their responsive brief. (Garland, Leah)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 2/6/2023; that the Motions [Doc. #70 , #71 , #72 , #73 , #74 , #83 ] are hereby GRANTED, and the appearances of moving counsel are deemed withdrawn. The Clerk is directed to terminate attorneys John H. Beisner, Terri L. Bruksch, Michael V. Powell, Seth Michael Roberts, Jessica D. Miller, and Melissa A. Prickett from the Court's ECF notification service list in this case as of the date of this Order. (Carter, Alexus)
February 3, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #83 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NAVAN WARD, JR as to Melissa A. Prickett, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Blay, Debbie)
February 2, 2023 Filing 83 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NAVAN WARD, JR as to Melissa A. Prickett by on behalf of SHERRY CAMPBELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(WARD, NAVAN)
January 31, 2023 Motion Submitted: #80 MOTION Extend Word Limit for Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine re #48 MOTION in Limine AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
January 31, 2023 Email to/from Plaintiff's counsel, Navan Ward, on 1/31/2023 advising the Clerk's Office that there is no objection to #80 Defendants Motion to Extend Word Limits for Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motions in Limine. (Blay, Debbie)
January 27, 2023 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION in Limine AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE filed by SHERRY CAMPBELL filed by DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. Replies due by 2/10/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(WELLS, DIXIE)
January 27, 2023 Filing 81 BRIEF re #80 MOTION Extend Word Limit for Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine re #48 MOTION in Limine AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE by Defendants DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. filed by DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, DIXIE)
January 27, 2023 Filing 80 MOTION Extend Word Limit for Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine re #48 MOTION in Limine AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE by DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. Response to Motion due by 2/17/2023 (WELLS, DIXIE)
January 27, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney TIFFANY BIRLEY on behalf of Plaintiff SHERRY CAMPBELL ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3481524.) (BIRLEY, TIFFANY)
January 27, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney DAVID BYRNE on behalf of Plaintiff SHERRY CAMPBELL ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3481486.) (BYRNE, DAVID)
January 27, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney AIGNER SHANEA KOLOM on behalf of Plaintiff SHERRY CAMPBELL ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3481457.) (KOLOM, AIGNER)
January 27, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JAMES LAMPKIN, II on behalf of Plaintiff SHERRY CAMPBELL ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3481443.) (LAMPKIN, JAMES)
January 27, 2023 Filing 75 RESPONSE Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Plaintiff SHERRY CAMPBELL re #47 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, DEPUY INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL filed by SHERRY CAMPBELL. Replies due by 2/10/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(WARD, NAVAN)
January 24, 2023 Filing 74 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Jessica D. Miller by on behalf of DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, DIXIE)
January 24, 2023 Filing 73 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Seth Michael Roberts by on behalf of DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, DIXIE)
January 24, 2023 Filing 72 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Michael V. Powell by on behalf of DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, DIXIE)
January 24, 2023 Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Terri L. Bruksch by on behalf of DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, DIXIE)
January 24, 2023 Filing 70 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS for John H. Beisner by on behalf of DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, DIXIE)
January 24, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney NAVAN WARD, JR on behalf of Plaintiff SHERRY CAMPBELL ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3477768.) (WARD, NAVAN)
January 24, 2023 Motions Referred: RE: #71 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Terri L. Bruksch, #73 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Seth Michael Roberts, #74 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Jessica D. Miller, #70 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS for John H. Beisner, #72 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS as to Michael V. Powell, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Blay, Debbie)
January 23, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN H. WHITLEY on behalf of Plaintiff SHERRY CAMPBELL. (WHITLEY, BENJAMIN) Modified on 1/23/2023 to correct event. (Hicks, Samantha)
January 17, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS on behalf of Defendants DEPUY INC., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. (WELLS, DIXIE)
January 4, 2023 Filing 66 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
January 4, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Carter, Alexus)
January 3, 2023 Filing 65 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorneys JAMES M. STANTON, NAVAN WARD, JR., MELISSA A. PRICKETT, ROGER L. MANDEL, JESSICA D. MILLER, JOHN H. BEISNER, MICHAEL V. POWELL, SETH MICHAEL ROBERTS, and TERRI BRUKSCH. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 2/2/2023 (Attachments: #1 30 Day Letter - NAVAN WARD, JR., #2 30 Day Letter - MELISSA A. PRICKETT, #3 30 Day Letter - ROGER L. MANDEL, #4 30 Day Letter - JESSICA D. MILLER, #5 30 Day Letter - JOHN H. BEISNER, #6 30 Day Letter - MICHAEL V. POWELL, #7 30 Day Letter - SETH MICHAEL ROBERTS, #8 30 Day Letter - TERRI BRUKSCH) (Carter, Alexus)
December 30, 2022 Filing 64 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:11-cv-01959. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 - Pursuant to Case Management Order #1 [Dkt. 20] and 28 U.S.C 1404, this Court transfers the identified cases to the appropriate United States District Court as identified above. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/30/2022) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Motion in Limine. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/30/2022) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 30, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of the Special Master's rulings. After reviewing the pleadings on file including the parties' joint status reports [Dkts. 37, 53] and conducting a telephonic hearing on December 29, 2022 [Dkt. 57], the special master recommends transferring this case for further proceedings because this case is in the process of completing discovery and ready to be set for trial; consequently, the case would no longer benefit from inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings before this Court. Further, the special master recommends transferring the case to the Middle District of North Carolina pursuant to the recommendation in the parties' joint status report [Dkt. 50]. The following motions are currently pending in this case: Motions to Exclude [Dkts. 38, 39, 40, 41, 42]; Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Dkt. 45]; and Motions in Limine [Dkts. 47, 48]. Because ruling on these motions will directly impact the claims, defenses, and presentation and admissibility of evidence at trial, the special master recommends this Court defer ruling on these motions to permit consideration by the transferee court which will have responsibility for putting the case on trial. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 30, 2022 Filing 58 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc re: #42 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR LIMIT DEFENSE EXPERT OPINIONS WITH MEMORANDUM OF SUPPORT (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 57 Administrative Record consisting of REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE HAD ON THURSDAY, DECEMBER 29, 2022 filed by Special Master. (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 56 RESPONSE filed by Sherry Campbell re: #38 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of the Special Master's rulings. By January 3, 2023, the parties are directed to file a joint status report with a list of any filing a party desires to be included in this individual case from the docket of In re: Depuy Orthopaedics 3:11-MD-2244-K pending in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. The joint status report shall provide a single list of requested filings in chronological order identified by docket number and document title. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [Dkt. 28]. On December 2, 2022, the Special Master recommended denial of the motion and no objections have been filed and therefore the motion is DENIED as moot as the special master has already addressed the concerns identified at a previous conference with counsel. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/28/2022) (chmb) Modified on 12/28/2022 (chmb). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 53 Joint STATUS REPORT (Third) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 52 RESPONSE filed by Sherry Campbell re: #40 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF ALBERT H. BURSTEIN, PH.D., J. MARCUS HOLLIS, PH.D. AND NATHANIEL YOUNG, M.S. REGARDING THE NATURE AND MEDICAL CAUSE OF PLAINTIFFS ALLEGED INJURIES (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 51 RESPONSE filed by Sherry Campbell re: #39 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF MARI TRUMAN (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 50 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION IN LIMINE re #48 MOTION in Limine AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Sherry Campbell (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 21, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION in Limine AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Sherry Campbell with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 21, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 21, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of hearing. On December 2, 2022, the parties were directed to file a joint status report by December 16, 2022. By 5:00 p.m. Central on December 27, 2022, the parties are directed to file an updated joint status report. The parties are directed to attend a telephonic status conference on December 29, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central using the following information: Call in number 800.977.8002; Passcode 8325765#. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sherry Campbell with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of amendment to correct technical error in the original docket entry. The original complaint [Dkt. 1] was direct-filed in the Northern District of Texas pursuant to this Court's Case Management Order #1 in MDL 2244 [Dkt. 20]. By December 22, 2022, the parties are directed to file a joint status report with the Court providing their recommendations on a court of appropriate jurisdiction for trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. [Dkt. 20, *paragraph* 17]. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of the special mater's rulings. The original complaint [Dkt. 1] was direct-filed in the Northern District of Texas pursuant to this Court's Case Management Order #1 in MDL 2244 [Dkt. 20]. By December 22, 2022, the parties are directed to file a joint status report with the Court providing their recommendations on a court of appropriate jurisdiction for trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. [Dkt. 20, 17]. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR LIMIT DEFENSE EXPERT OPINIONS WITH MEMORANDUM OF SUPPORT filed by Sherry Campbell with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION PLANTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR LIMIT NON-RETAINED WITNESS TESTIMONY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Sherry Campbell with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 15, 2022 Filing 40 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF ALBERT H. BURSTEIN, PH.D., J. MARCUS HOLLIS, PH.D. AND NATHANIEL YOUNG, M.S. REGARDING THE NATURE AND MEDICAL CAUSE OF PLAINTIFFS ALLEGED INJURIES (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits Part 5, #6 Proposed Order) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 15, 2022 Filing 39 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF MARI TRUMAN (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 15, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John H Beisner added to party DePuy Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party DePuy Orthopaedics Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party Johnson & Johnson International (pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party Johnson & Johnson Services Inc(pty:dft) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 9, 2022 Filing 37 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 2, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of the Special Master's rulings: Pursuant to the special master's report of December 1, 2022 [Dkt. 35], and the Court's Scheduling Order of September 16, 2022 [Dkt. 27], the parties are directed to confer and file, by December 9, 2022, a joint status report regarding any matters that require the Court's attention to comply with the Court's Scheduling Order. The Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [Dkt. 28] should be DENIED as moot as the special master has already addressed the concerns identified at a previous conference with counsel. filed by Special Master (Stanton, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 1, 2022 Filing 35 SPECIAL MASTER'S STATUS REPORT - Presently there are eighty-two cases remaining in this MDL. Sixty-six of the remaining cases are on a scheduling order where all pre-trial filings will be complete by December 30, 2022; twelve of the cases are on a scheduling order with pre-trial filings complete by March 3, 2023; and, four cases are subject to dismissal if service is not quickly accomplished. Although over half of the remaining cases in the MDL have efficiently moved forward on the scheduling order, a select few cases have required significant attention through motions practice and some parties stated inability to meet the Court's deadlines. Many of the issues raised in the motions were resolved through hearings or through agreement. In the previous 45 days, I have conducted numerous formal and informal status conferences. The transcripts and docket entry from those conferences are attached and are being docketed in all cases remaining in the MDL because they could affect outstanding legal and factual disputes among the parties in any of the cases. (Attachments: #1 10-18-2022 Conference Transcript, #2 10-19-2022 Conference Transcript, #3 10-23-2022 Conference Transcript, #4 10-28-2022 Conference Transcript, #5 Docket Entry 1283, #6 11-16-2022 Conference Transcript) (Stanton, James M.) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 34 On November 3, 2022, the special master conducted a discovery conference with Austin Mehr, counsel for plaintiff in Coblin - 3:18-cv-00524-K and Hill - 3:14-cv-03694-K, and Matthew Morrison, counsel for plaintiff in Ellison - 3:12-cv-2498-K, as well as Terri Bruksch, counsel for defendants, regarding the deposition of Dr. Al Burstein. Counsel reached an agreement that Dr. Burstein could be available for deposition in Sarasota, Florida on December 13 and 14, 2022, regarding his opinions in the three cases.Ms. Bruksch informed the special master that Dr. Burstein is also designated as an expert in the following cases: Near - 3:11-cv-01452-K; Ortiz - 3:11-cv-01597-K; Campbell - 3:11-cv-01959-K; Wright - 3:11-cv-02534-K; Brown - 3:11-cv-02574-K; Getz - 3:11-cv-02890-K; Campbell - 3:11-cv-02957-K; Greenwood - 3:11-cv-03585-K; Singer - 3:12-cv-00384-K; Baldwin - 3:12-cv-00731-K; O'Connell - 3:12-cv-01480-K; Gulledge - 3:12-cv-03301-K; Nation - 3:12-cv-03369-K; Taffurelli - 3:12-cv-03371-K; Winkelmeyer - 3:13-cv-01172-K; Jakelis - 3:13-cv-01699-K; Holland - 3:13-cv-02935-K; Jozwiak - 3:14-cv-00365-K; Buonaiuto - 3:14-cv-02750-K; Canty - 3:15-cv-00440-K; Sterling - 3:17-cv-00819-K; Diodato - 3:17-cv-01251-K; Winegarden - 3:18-cv-00159-K; Norvell - 3:18-cv-00381-K; Young - 3:18-cv-00474-K; Fleischman - 3:20-cv-02881-K; Hall - 3:21-cv-01321-K. Counsel for plaintiffs in the additional cases are instructed to coordinate with Mr. Mehr and Mr. Morrison to conduct their questioning, if any, of Dr. Burstein on December 13 and 14, 2022. If agreement cannot be reached, an additional conference with the special master will be conducted. (Stanton, James M.) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 33 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Remote Hearing Conference held on 10/19/2022 before James M. Stanton, Court-Ordered Special Master. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amber A Thompson. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 32 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Remote Hearing Conference held on 10/18/2022 before James M. Stanton, Court-Ordered Special Master. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael D O'Connor. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
October 25, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc re: #28 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits) (Beisner, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
October 12, 2022 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
October 12, 2022 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
October 11, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Sherry Campbell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b), the Court enters this Scheduling Order: 1. Each Plaintiff shall amend pleadings by September 30, 2022; Each Defendant shall amend pleadings by October 14, 2022. 2. Each Plaintiff shall provide expert designations, materials, and reports required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by October 28, 2022; the deposition of each Plaintiff expert shall be conducted between November 7, 2022, and November 18, 2022. 3. Each Defendant shall provide expert designations, materials, and reports required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by November 4, 2002; the deposition of each Defendant expert shall be conducted between November 21, 2022 and December 2, 2022. 4. All discovery shall be completed by December 9, 2022. 5. All dispositive motions or Daubert motions shall be filed by December 16, 2022; and any response to the motions shall be filed by December 30, 2022. 6. The parties shall file motions in limine as well as any motions seeking to limit the testimony of any witness at trial for any reason by December 21, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/16/2022) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying ALL Joint Motion(s) to Stay CMO 12 Obligations in these cases. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/16/2022) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
July 5, 2022 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Stay CMO 12 OBLIGATIONS TO DECEMBER 1, 2022 filed by Sherry Campbell (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 24 Pursuant to the Court's Case Management Order No. 13 [Doc. 1150], the Court-appointed Special Master and Mediator requested that counsel for Plaintiff provide the most convenient city for Plaintiff to attend in-person mediation following an unsuccessful mediation Zoom mediation. The Parties have provided a city. The Mediator has confirmed the location and will provide a date, and the mediation will occur on or before May 31, 2022. (James M. Stanton - Special Master.) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Stay CMO 12 OBLIGATIONS TO MAY 26, 2022 filed by Sherry Campbell (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
November 2, 2021 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Stay CMO 12 Obligations to April 11, 2022 filed by Sherry Campbell (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
November 2, 2021 Filing 21 Amended STATUS REPORT AMENDED JOINT STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO STAY CMO 12 OBLIGATIONS TO APRIL 11, 2022 filed by Sherry Campbell. (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 20 Joint STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO STAY CMO 12 OBLIGATIONS TO MARCH 1, 2022 filed by Sherry Campbell. (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Joint to Stay CMO 12 Deadlines to October 25, 2021. The Parties and DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report on November 1, 2021, regarding the Status of this Case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/23/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master James M. Stanton: Status Conference held on 7/12/2021. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant appeared via teleconference and advised the court that the parties have not reached a settlement. Pursuant to CMO 13 [Doc. 1150], the parties are directed to attend mediation within 120 days of this order \ to be scheduled via email correspondence. (James M. Stanton Special Master). (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 Pursuant to the Court's Case Management Order No. 13 [Doc. 1150], the Court-appointed Special Master James M. Stanton requires counsel for the parties to attend a telephonic status conference on July 12, 2021, at 9:20 a.m. Central Standard Time to receive an update from counsel on the status of the litigation and scheduling a mediation by calling 800-920-7487 and using passcode 67938884#. (James M. Stanton - Special Master.) (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay CMO 12 Obligations to October 25, 2021 filed by DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of filing Case Management OrdersThe following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below.#CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 # PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM# CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 # DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET. (lrl) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
March 14, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica D Miller on behalf of DePuy and Johnson Defendants. (jeh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 2, 2012 NOTICE FROM THE SPECIAL MASTER: For the convenience of parties who desire to listen to the August 9, 2012, proceedings via telephone, the Special Master has arranged a call in number (800-700-7784) and access code (256523). Telephonic attendees are advised, however, that they will be unable to address the Court during the hearing, and the telephone call will be locked at 10:25 a.m. to avoid disruption on the line from others joining the conference. Counsel attending the Scheduling Conference in person may bring their computers, cell phones, and other devices into the courtroom; however, all electronic devices must be TURNED OFF. James M. Stanton, Special Master - MDL 2244. (drh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
July 17, 2012 Notice of filing Orders:The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below.#ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE: A conference with the Court is set for 8/9/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade.#ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEYS APPEARING IN MDL 2244. (drh) Modified to correct links on 4/9/2018 (cea). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
June 21, 2012 Notice of filing Case Management OrdersThe following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below.#CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #5#CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #6 Attorney-Client Privilege and Work-Product Privilege Protocol.#CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #7 Order Regarding Management of Timekeeping, Cost Reimbursement and Related Common Benefit Issues. (drh) Modified to correct link on 4/9/2018 (cea). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
April 23, 2012 NOTICE FROM THE SPECIAL MASTER: For the convenience of parties who desire to listen to the April 25, 2012, proceedings via telephone, the Special Master has arranged a call in number (866.285.7778) and access code (6594627). Telephonic attendees are advised, however, that they will be unable to address the Court during the hearing, and the telephone call will be locked at 9:25 a.m. to avoid disruption on the line from others joining the conference. Counsel attending the Scheduling Conference in person may bring their computers, cell phones, and other devices into the courtroom; however, all electronic devices must be TURNED OFF. James M. Stanton, Special Master - MDL 2244 (drh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
April 6, 2012 NOTICE FROM THE SPECIAL MASTER: On April 6, 2012, the Court directed the parties to confer with the Special Master in preparation for the April 25, 2012, Conference on Scheduling. Plaintiffs shall coordinate their conference with the Special Master through the Court-appointed Plaintiff's Executive Committee. The Special Master is also arranging for parties to listen to the April 25, 2012, proceedings via telephone. Telephonic attendees are reminded, however, that they will be unable to address the Court during the hearing. An additional notice providing details of observing the April 25, 2012, proceedings telephonically will be provided closer to the hearing. James M. Stanton, Special Master - MDL 2244 (drh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE: A Conference on Scheduling is hereby set for Wednesday, April 25, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. at 1100 Commerce Street, Room 1625, Dallas, Texas 75242. In preparation for this Conference on Scheduling, the parties are DIRECTED to confer with the Special Master within 7 days of this order. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/5/2012) (drh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES: Through respective lead counsel, the parties have agreed to extend all existing deadlines for pleadings and motions (including but not limited to answers and jurisdictional briefing) in all cases in this MDL proceeding to allow counsel an opportunity to address those issues in a proposed case management order that they are preparing for submission to the Court in the short term. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the foregoing motion is GRANTED. The deadlines in all cases in this MDL proceeding are hereby CONTINUED pending the entry of a case management order. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/7/2012) (jrb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER LIFTING STAY: The Court orders that the stay is hereby LIFTED and discovery and motion practice shall proceed in any case filed as a part of 3:11-MD-2244-K, and any tag-along actions over which this Court acquires jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/10/2012) (drh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER: The Court now appoints James M. Stanton of Andrews Kurth, LLP as Special Master pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 53. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/9/2012) (drh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #3: The Court hereby designates counsel to act on behalf of the Plaintiffs in the DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. It is anticipated that further appointments to the existing subcommittees, or the addition of further subcommittees, will be approved, as necessary, as the litigation progresses. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/9/2012) (drh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
September 19, 2011 ***Set MDL-2244 Flag (Entered on 9/19/2011) (drh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael V Powell on behalf of DePuy Inc., DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Powell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Michael Roberts on behalf of DePuy Inc., DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Roberts, Seth) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2. All submissions on suggestions for conducting this litigation shall be made within thirty days of the date this order is signed. As ordered by the Court at the hearing, all attorneys must sign up for the Northern District of Texas's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing system or the attorneys will be removed as "Attorneys to be Noticed" in the case. Also, all documents filed in this case must be filed electronically. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/10/2011) (jkm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Case reassigned to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/8/2011) (dnc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 8, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DePuy Inc., DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (skt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 8, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE filed by Sherry Campbell (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 8, 2011 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sherry Campbell. (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]
August 8, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DePuy Inc., DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. filed by Sherry Campbell. Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the #Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-4048786) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (Ward, Navan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/30/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPBELL v. DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: SPECIAL MASTER
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Represented By: JAMES M. STANTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY CAMPBELL
Represented By: Roger L Mandel
Represented By: Navan Ward, Jr
Represented By: Melissa A Prickett
Represented By: AIGNER SHANEA KOLOM
Represented By: BENJAMIN H. WHITLEY
Represented By: NAVAN WARD, JR.
Represented By: ROGER L. MANDEL
Represented By: TIFFANY BIRLEY
Represented By: DAVID BYRNE
Represented By: JAMES LAMPKIN, II
Represented By: MELISSA A. PRICKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: JOHN H. BEISNER
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: DIXIE THOMAS WELLS
Represented By: JESSICA D. MILLER
Represented By: MICHAEL V. POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY INC.
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: JOHN H. BEISNER
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: MICHAEL V. POWELL
Represented By: DIXIE THOMAS WELLS
Represented By: JESSICA D. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: DIXIE THOMAS WELLS
Represented By: JESSICA D. MILLER
Represented By: MICHAEL V. POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: JOHN H. BEISNER
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: DIXIE THOMAS WELLS
Represented By: JESSICA D. MILLER
Represented By: MICHAEL V. POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: JOHN H. BEISNER
Represented By: DIXIE THOMAS WELLS
Represented By: JESSICA D. MILLER
Represented By: MICHAEL V. POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: JOHN H. BEISNER
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Terri Bruksch
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: DIXIE THOMAS WELLS
Represented By: JESSICA D. MILLER
Represented By: MICHAEL V. POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?