UHLENBERG v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: ARWEN UHLENBERG
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Interested Party: SSAOGCOMMS and US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - SOCIAL SECURITY NOTICING
Case Number: 1:2023cv00330
Filed: April 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2023 Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 402.00. Receipt Number 1754. (Bowers, Alexis)
May 23, 2023 TEXT ORDER directing the Clerk to proceed with the service of process procedures applicable to Social Security cases, in light of Plaintiff's payment of the filing fee (as documented on the Docket today). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 05/23/2023. (AULD, L.)
May 23, 2023 Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. The Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Answer due 60 days from filing on this notice. Answer/Certified Administrative Record due by 7/24/2023. (Bowers, Alexis)
May 15, 2023 TEXT ORDER (A) denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP, for failure to comply with Text Order dated 04/21/2023, and (B) requiring Plaintiff to pay the filing fee by 06/15/2023. Failure by Plaintiff to comply with this Text Order shall result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 05/15/2023. (AULD, L.)
April 21, 2023 TEXT ORDER (A) deferring ruling on #2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP, and (B) requiring Plaintiff to file, on or before 05/12/2023, a supplement to #2 Application, signed under oath or penalty of perjury, which shows how Plaintiff meets the expenses of daily living (other than food), such as for shelter, and, if others provide for such expenses, why they cannot pay the costs that pauper status would cover. In #2 Application, Plaintiff reported no monthly expenses and no means of support other than a small amount of government food aid. If Plaintiff lacks any stable housing, the required supplement may simply so state; however, if others (such as family members and/or friends) provide regular support to Plaintiff for necessities like shelter, the required supplement shall disclose that support and shall explain why the persons providing it cannot provide Plaintiff with the funds necessary to pay the costs pauper status would cover. Failure by Plaintiff to comply with this Text Order shall result in the denial of #2 Application. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/21/2023. (AULD, L.)
April 21, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
April 21, 2023 Motions Referred: RE: #2 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
April 20, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Arwen Uhlenberg. (NOBLE, VIRGINIA) Modified on 4/20/2023 to correct event type (Bowers, Alexis).
April 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by Arwen Uhlenberg.(NOBLE, VIRGINIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UHLENBERG v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARWEN UHLENBERG
Represented By: VIRGINIA ANNE NOBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: SSA NOTICING
Represented By: US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE-SOCIAL SECURITY NOTICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGCOMMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - SOCIAL SECURITY NOTICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?