NELSON v. ROCKINGHAM COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PAUL NELSON
Defendant: ROCKINGHAM COUNTY, Magistrate Carter, SHERIFF SAMUEL SCOTT PAGE, ROCKINGHAM COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, CITY OF MADISON, OFFICER KEITH BENFIELD, MPD and OFFICER MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD
Case Number: 1:2023cv00488
Filed: June 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY, filed by Defendants KEITH BENFIELD, MPD, CITY OF MADISON, MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD, to Response to #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KEITH BENFIELD, MPD, CITY OF MADISON, MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD. (POSEY, RACHEL)
July 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF MADISON, MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD, KEITH BENFIELD, MPD, #26 Brief, filed by CITY OF MADISON, MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD, KEITH BENFIELD, MPD filed by MICHAEL PAUL NELSON. Replies due by 8/14/2023 (SIMMONS, MONTY)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form). Response due 8/25/2023 - (Williamson, Wanda)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SAMUEL SCOTT PAGE, ROCKINGHAM COUNTY. (FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 BRIEF re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants KEITH BENFIELD, MPD, CITY OF MADISON, MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD filed by KEITH BENFIELD, MPD, CITY OF MADISON, MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD. (POSEY, RACHEL)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by KEITH BENFIELD, MPD, CITY OF MADISON, MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2023 (POSEY, RACHEL)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #18 Motion as to his alternative request for special appearance, and Attorney William Monty Simmons is admitted to practice in this case by Special Appearance under Local Rule 83.9(d), and the requirement of association with local counsel is waived. Attorney Simmons still remains as counsel for Plaintiff in this case following the transfer of the case from South Carolina, and any requests for accommodation for Plaintiff may be presented by Attorney Simmons. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/6/23.(Garrett, Kim)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney RACHEL GAIL POSEY on behalf of Defendants KEITH BENFIELD, MPD, CITY OF MADISON, MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD (POSEY, RACHEL)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (HARTZOG, DAN)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (HARTZOG, DAN)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (HARTZOG, DAN)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DAN MCCORD HARTZOG, JR on behalf of Defendants KEITH BENFIELD, MPD, CITY OF MADISON, MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD (HARTZOG, DAN)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD OR GRANTING SPECIAL APPEARANCE UNDER LOCAL RULE 83.9(d), filed by MICHAEL PAUL NELSON.(Taylor, Abby)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions Referred: RE: #18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MONTY SIMMONS, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Bowers, Alexis)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Bowers, Alexis)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 4:23-cv-00704. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: On June 6, 2023, Defendant Rockingham County and Defendant Sheriff Samuel Scott Page filed a Consent Motion to Transfer Venue to the Middle District of North Carolina, asserting that pursuant to Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as well as 28 U.S.C. 1631 and 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), transfer of this litigation to that court is proper. (DE #12 .) Within the Motion, these Defendants note that all Defendants consent to this transfer, and Plaintiff does not oppose the Consent Motion. (DE #12 .) Accordingly, the Court grants the #12 Motion to Transfer Venue and orders that this action be transferred to the Middle District of North Carolina. As requested in the Motion, all Defendants have 21 days or the remainder of their original time to respond, whichever is longer, to further respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Court notes that currently pending is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery. (DE #10 .) Within Plaintiff's Motion, he seeks additional time to identify "Doe Defendants" and seeks an order authorizing Plaintiff to serve a third-party subpoena duces tecum to Rockingham County Detention Center. (DE #10 .) Because this case is being transferred to another court, Defendants' counsel is directed to file any such response to this Motion in the Middle District of North Carolina after this case is transferred to that district. Defendant Rockingham County and Defendant Sheriff Samuel Scott Page's #12 Consent Motion to Transfer Venue is granted. The case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina. Signed by Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 6/20/2023.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of North Carolina by Samuel Scott Page, Rockingham County, Rockingham County Detention Center. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Racine, Russell) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 11 Reason: Document was filed separately but should have an attachment to document #10. Corrected Filing Document Number #10 . (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery by Michael Paul Nelson. Response to Motion due by 6/7/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Order) Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel. Motions referred to Kaymani D West. (Simmons, William). Modified on 5/25/2023 to add document which was filed separately but should have been filed as an attachment (prou, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Paul Nelson. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simmons, William) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Paul Nelson. Service due by 8/21/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Plaintiff's Clinical Psychologist Comments Regarding Legal Abuse Syndrome) (Simmons, William) Modified on 5/24/2023 to add description to exhibit (prou, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: On May 8, 2023, Attorney Russel M. Racine of Cranfill Sumner, LLP, filed a motion seeking leave to enter a limited appearance on behalf of Defendants City of Madison, Keith Benefield, and Matthew Michael (the "City Defendants"), for the purpose of moving the court for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Counsel represents the current deadline for responding to the Complaint is May 9, 2023. For good cause shown, the Motion, ECF No. 5, is granted. The deadline to respond to the Complaint is now June 8, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/9/2023.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Keith Benefield, Madison, City of, Matthew Michael. Response to Motion due by 5/22/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PO Granting Extension to Answer)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Racine, Russell) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Keith Benefield, Magistrate Carter, Madison, City of, Matthew Michael, Samuel Scott Page, Rockingham County, Rockingham County Detention Center. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Michael Paul Nelson.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith Benefield, Magistrate Carter, Madison, City of, Matthew Michael, Samuel Scott Page, Rockingham County, Rockingham County Detention Center ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10954959.), filed by Michael Paul Nelson. Service due by 5/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Desmon C. Mitchell, Ph.D.)(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 6/20/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NELSON v. ROCKINGHAM COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PAUL NELSON
Represented By: MONTY SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKINGHAM COUNTY
Represented By: RUSSELL M. RACINE
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF SAMUEL SCOTT PAGE
Represented By: RUSSELL M. RACINE
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKINGHAM COUNTY DETENTION CENTER
Represented By: RUSSELL M. RACINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF MADISON
Represented By: RUSSELL M. RACINE
Represented By: DAN MCCORD HARTZOG, JR.
Represented By: RACHEL GAIL POSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER KEITH BENFIELD, MPD
Represented By: RUSSELL M. RACINE
Represented By: RACHEL GAIL POSEY
Represented By: DAN MCCORD HARTZOG, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER MATTHEW MICHAEL, MPD
Represented By: RUSSELL M. RACINE
Represented By: DAN MCCORD HARTZOG, JR.
Represented By: RACHEL GAIL POSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?