SIDES v. KIMBROUGH et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SIDES
Defendant: BOBBY KIMBROUGH, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR., SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY and PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY
Case Number: 1:2023cv00502
Filed: June 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties by COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT.(RUSSELL, STEPHEN)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Manual Filing Exhibit 1 - Videos 1 through 7 in paper form with the Clerk's Office (RUSSELL, STEPHEN)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality must file a response within 14 days that includes the materials required by L.R. 5.4(c)(3).] by COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT. Response to Motion due by 8/14/2023 (RUSSELL, STEPHEN)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Joel Surratt by Defendants COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Videos 1 through 7))(RUSSELL, STEPHEN)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Christy Byers by Defendants COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Insurance Policy))(RUSSELL, STEPHEN)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT filed by COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT. (RUSSELL, STEPHEN)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT. Response to Motion due by 8/21/2023 (RUSSELL, STEPHEN)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ANDREW R. MARSHALL on behalf of Defendants COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT (MARSHALL, ANDREW)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Bowers, Alexis)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for all Defendants (excluding the defendant named as John Doe Corporation). Answer due by 7/31/2023. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 6/23/2023. (Brubaker, John)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT. (State Court documents originally filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, case number 23cvs2539, issued on 05/19/2023, listed as Exhibit 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Bowers, Alexis)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ANTHONY SIDES. (State Court documents originally filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, case number 23cvs2539, listed as Exhibit 1 to the #1 Petition for Removal)(Bowers, Alexis)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time))(RUSSELL, STEPHEN)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ALAN W. DUNCAN on behalf of Defendants COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT (DUNCAN, ALAN)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR on behalf of Defendants COUNTY OF FORSYTH, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, KELA MARIE SPAIN, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT (RUSSELL, STEPHEN)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Forsyth County Superior Court, case number 23cvs2539 Notice of Removal against ANTHONY SIDES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3591802.), filed by SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN, PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY, KELA MARIE SPAIN, DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON, BOBBY KIMBROUGH, JOEL GREGORY SURRATT, COUNTY OF FORSYTH, KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY, DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (State Court Summons - McPherson and Holley), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Summons - John Doe Corp. and County of Forsyth), #4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Summons - Kimbrough and Morrissey), #5 Exhibit 5 (State Court Summons - Didomizio and Mukrdechian), #6 Exhibit 6 (State Court Summons - Spain and Surratt), #7 Exhibit 7 (General Civil Action Coversheet), #8 Exhibit 8 (Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal))(RUSSELL, STEPHEN) Modified on 6/22/2023 to add State Court Information. (Bowers, Alexis).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIDES v. KIMBROUGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SIDES
Represented By: CHARLES ALI EVERAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBBY KIMBROUGH
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW R. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF FORSYTH
Represented By: STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR.
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: ANDREW R. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN RICARDO DIDOMIZIO, JR.
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW R. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN EDWARDS MUKRDECHIAN
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW R. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELA MARIE SPAIN
Represented By: STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR.
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: ANDREW R. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL GREGORY SURRATT
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW R. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMIAN DANIEL MCPHERSON
Represented By: STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR.
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: ANDREW R. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIAM DEQUAN HOLLEY
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW R. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK MICHAEL MORRISSEY
Represented By: ALAN W. DUNCAN
Represented By: STEPHEN MCDANIEL RUSSELL, JR.
Represented By: ANDREW R. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?