COUNTY OF MOORE v. THE 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF MOORE
Defendant: 3M COMPANY, AGC CHEMICALS AMERICAS, INC., AGC INC., ARCHROMA MANAGEMENT, LLC, ARCHROMA US, INC., ARKEMA, INC., BASF CORPORATION, BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, CHEMDESIGN PRODUCTS INC., CHEMGUARD, INC., CHEMICALS INC., CLARIANT CORPORATION, CORTEVA, INC., DEEPWATER CHEMICALS, INC., John Doe Defendants 1-49, DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC., DYNAX CORPORATION, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, KIDDE PLC, INC., NATION FORD CHEMICAL COMPANY, NATIONAL FOAM, INC., RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC., THE 3M COMPANY, MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO., ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD., UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, CHUBB FIRE, LTD. and THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00636
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Filing 12 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual court and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order transferring this action to District of South Carolina. (Monroe, Brooke)
August 21, 2023 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-147) Re: MDL 2873 transferring this action to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018. Received and filed on August 21, 2023. (Monroe, Brooke)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 08/14/2023, that the Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [Doc. #9 ] is hereby GRANTED, and that if this action is transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foam Products multidistrict litigation ("AFFF MDL"), then the deadlines for all Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be in accordance with the established rules and procedures in the AFFF MDL. Should the Judicial Panel on the Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") decline to transfer this action to the AFFF MDL, Defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the JPML to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Monroe, Brooke)
August 9, 2023 Motion Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint. (Daniel, J)
August 9, 2023 Motions No Longer Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint. (Daniel, J)
August 9, 2023 Motion Referred MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint. (Daniel, J)
August 7, 2023 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER)
August 2, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Bowers, Alexis)
August 2, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Bowers, Alexis)
August 1, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (State Court document originally filed in Moore County Superior Court, case number 23CVS892, issued 6/22/2023, filed at Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
August 1, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by COUNTY OF MOORE. (State Court document original filed in Moore Count Superior Court, case number 23CVS892, filed at Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
July 31, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC for TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP.. (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER)
July 31, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC for CHEMGUARD, INC... (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER)
July 31, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER J. BLAKE on behalf of Defendants CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER)
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against COUNTY OF MOORE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3619294.), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Moore County 23-CVS-892, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COUNTY OF MOORE v. THE 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF MOORE
Represented By: W. BEN ATWATER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC CHEMICALS AMERICAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCHROMA MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCHROMA US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARKEMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEMDESIGN PRODUCTS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEMGUARD, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. BLAKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEMICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARIANT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORTEVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEEPWATER CHEMICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYNAX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIDDE PLC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATION FORD CHEMICAL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOAM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. BLAKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB FIRE, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?