DAVIS v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: SCOTTIE JUNIOR DAVIS
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 1:2023cv00695
Filed: August 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. The Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Answer due 60 days from filing on this notice. Answer/Certified Administrative Record due by 11/27/2023. (Bowers, Alexis)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/25/2023, that Plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). The Court will apply the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), effective December 1, 2022. The Clerk's office is directed to issue a Notice of Service pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (Bowers, Alexis)
September 22, 2023 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff SCOTTIE JUNIOR DAVIS. (PIEMONTE, GEORGE)
August 20, 2023 TEXT ORDER (A) deferring ruling on #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, and (B) requiring Plaintiff to file, on or before 09/25/2023, a supplement, signed under oath or penalty of perjury, identifying any regular sources of support she receives to meet her basic necessities of life, such as food and shelter, and explaining why the person(s) who supply that support cannot provide her with the funds to pay the fees and costs that pauper status otherwise would cover. If Plaintiff lacks any regular sources of support and essentially lives a homeless existence, she may simply so state (under oath or penalty of perjury). Failure by Plaintiff to comply with this Text Order shall result in the denial of #2 Application. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/20/2023. (AULD, L.)
August 17, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
August 17, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
August 16, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by SCOTTIE JUNIOR DAVIS. (PIEMONTE, GEORGE)
August 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by SCOTTIE JUNIOR DAVIS.(PIEMONTE, GEORGE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTTIE JUNIOR DAVIS
Represented By: GEORGE C. PIEMONTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: SSA NOTICING
Represented By: US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE-SOCIAL SECURITY NOTICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?