HALL v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL HALL
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 1:2023cv00733
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE REGARDING REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Notice is given that many districts around the country have had great success in encouraging consent to magistrate judges in social security appeal cases. Maximizing dispositions on consent rather than through reports and recommendations maintains the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of these cases, as well as realizing the benefits of bringing about a quicker resolution of the appeal than the report and recommendation process. Consistent with the direction of the Administrative Office of the United States Courts, this Court reminds the government and members of the social security bar of the consent option, and its time savings for litigants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the Parties consult with their clients concerning the foregoing and complete and return the attached MDNC Form 85 within 30 days informing the Clerk's Office as to whether or not they consent to disposition by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Entered at the direction of the Chief Judge. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Bowers, Alexis)
October 4, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE to Parties in Social Security Case. Plaintiff's Dispositive Brief - SSA due by 11/3/2023. Defendant's Dispositive Brief - SSA due by 12/4/2023. Plaintiff's Reply Brief - SSA due by 12/18/2023. (Bowers, Alexis)
October 4, 2023 Filing 5 SEALED Answer/Certified Administrative Record - Social Security Case filed by Defendant KILOLO KIJAKAZI. The record is available in paper format at the Clerk's Office (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16, #16 Part 17, #17 Part 18, #18 Part 19, #19 Part 20)(REED, MARGARET)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MARGARET REED on behalf of Defendant KILOLO KIJAKAZI (REED, MARGARET)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/31/2023, that Plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). The Court will apply the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), effective December 1, 2022. The Clerk's office is directed to issue a Notice of Service pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (Bowers, Alexis)
August 31, 2023 Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. The Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Answer due 60 days from filing on this notice. Answer/Certified Administrative Record due by 10/30/2023. (Bowers, Alexis)
August 30, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
August 30, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by CRYSTAL HALL. (ARROWOOD, DERRICK)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by CRYSTAL HALL.(ARROWOOD, DERRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL HALL
Represented By: DERRICK K. ARROWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: SSA NOTICING
Represented By: US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE-SOCIAL SECURITY NOTICING
Represented By: MARGARET REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?