PATTERSON et al v. VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ABIGAYLE PATTERSON and BRIAN OTTERS
Defendant: VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC, WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR., SCOTT CHAIM GREENBLATT and VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00762
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for Further Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond by 11/21/2023. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/06/2023. (AULD, L.)
November 3, 2023 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint,, #1 Petition for Removal,, by VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(GREENE, DUSTIN)
November 3, 2023 Motion Referred RE: #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint and #1 Petition for Removal to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Marsh, Keah)
September 19, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CAROLINE LEWIS WOLVERTON on behalf of Defendants SCOTT CHAIM GREENBLATT, WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3655516.) (WOLVERTON, CAROLINE)
September 19, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ANTHONY T. PIERCE on behalf of Defendants SCOTT CHAIM GREENBLATT, WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3655515.) (PIERCE, ANTHONY)
September 14, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint, #1 Petition for Removal by SCOTT CHAIM GREENBLATT, WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(GREENE, DUSTIN)
September 14, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Marsh, Keah)
September 14, 2023 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond by 11/14/2023. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/14/2023. (AULD, L.)
September 12, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR served on 8/28/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
September 12, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to SCOTT CHAIM GREENBLATT served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023; VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
September 12, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
September 12, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ANDREW L. FITZGERALD on behalf of Plaintiffs BRIAN OTTERS, ABIGAYLE PATTERSON (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
September 12, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (GREENE, DUSTIN)
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (GREENE, DUSTIN)
September 11, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Bowers, Alexis)
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC. (State Court documents originally filed in Moore County Superior Court, case number 23cvs1196, issued on 08/23/2023, listed as Exhibit 1 to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Bowers, Alexis)
September 11, 2023 Filing 4 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against SCOTT CHAIM GREENBLATT, WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC, filed by ABIGAYLE PATTERSON, BRIAN OTTERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (State Court documents originally filed in Moore County Superior Court, case number 23cvs1196, listed as Exhibit 1 to the #1 Petition for Removal)(Bowers, Alexis)
September 11, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Bowers, Alexis)
September 11, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Bowers, Alexis)
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH L. WINTERS on behalf of Defendants SCOTT CHAIM GREENBLATT, WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC (WINTERS, ELIZABETH)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WHITNEY R. PAKALKA on behalf of Defendants SCOTT CHAIM GREENBLATT, WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC (PAKALKA, WHITNEY)
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Moore County Superior Court, case number 23cvs1196 against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3647639.)(Related Case # 1:23-cv-00756), filed by Veterans Guardian VA Claim Consulting PAC, William Cooper Taylor, Jr, VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC, Scott Chaim Greenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Moore County Court File, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(GREENE, DUSTIN) Modified on 9/11/2023 to add State Court information. (Bowers, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON et al v. VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABIGAYLE PATTERSON
Represented By: ANDREW L. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN OTTERS
Represented By: ANDREW L. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING, LLC
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. WINTERS
Represented By: WHITNEY R. PAKALKA
Represented By: DUSTIN TIMOTHY GREENE
Represented By: ANTHONY T. PIERCE
Represented By: CAROLINE LEWIS WOLVERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOPER TAYLOR, JR.
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. WINTERS
Represented By: WHITNEY R. PAKALKA
Represented By: DUSTIN TIMOTHY GREENE
Represented By: ANTHONY T. PIERCE
Represented By: CAROLINE LEWIS WOLVERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT CHAIM GREENBLATT
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. WINTERS
Represented By: WHITNEY R. PAKALKA
Represented By: DUSTIN TIMOTHY GREENE
Represented By: ANTHONY T. PIERCE
Represented By: CAROLINE LEWIS WOLVERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VETERANS GUARDIAN VA CLAIM CONSULTING PAC
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. WINTERS
Represented By: WHITNEY R. PAKALKA
Represented By: DUSTIN TIMOTHY GREENE
Represented By: CAROLINE LEWIS WOLVERTON
Represented By: ANTHONY T. PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?