WOOD v. WELLPATH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DAVID RYAN WOOD
Defendant: WELLPATH, LLC, THE COUNTY OF ROWAN, J. TRAVIS ALLEN, KEVIN AUTEN, GREGORY HANNOLD, Ofc. JERRY EWART, JOHN DOE CORPORATION/PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, KEVIN JOHN CORRIGAN, ASHLEY ROWLAND, JACQUELIN MICHELE WILLIAMS, UNKNOWN WELLPATH PROVIDER(S) and OFFICER JERRY EWART
Case Number: 1:2023cv00811
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 22 Declaration of Proof of Service served on Jacquelin Michele Williams on 11/03/2023, filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Tracking)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
November 14, 2023 Filing 21 Declaration of Proof of Service served on John Doe Corporation/Pennsylvania National Mutual Insurance Company on 10/16/2023, filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Tracking)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
November 14, 2023 Filing 20 Declaration of Proof of Service served on Jerry Ewart on 10/16/2023, filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Tracking)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
November 14, 2023 Filing 19 Declaration of Proof of Service served on Kevin Auten on 10/23/2023, filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Tracking)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
November 14, 2023 Filing 18 Declaration of Proof of Service served on J. Travis Allen on 10/16/2023, filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Tracking)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 Declaration of Proof of Service served on The County of Rowan on 10/17/2023, filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Tracking)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
November 14, 2023 Filing 16 Declaration of Proof of Service served on Kevin John Corrigan on 10/17/2023, filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Tracking)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
November 14, 2023 Filing 15 Declaration of Proof of Service served on Ashley Rowland on 10/16/2023, filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Tracking)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
November 14, 2023 Filing 14 Declaration of Proof of Service served on Wellpath, LLC on 10/16/2023, filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Tracking)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
November 6, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by JOHN DOE CORPORATION/PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STILES, NED)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 11/06/2023, granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Rowan County, J. Travis Allen, Kevin Auten, Gregory Hannold, and Jerry Ewart may file and serve their answer or other responsive pleading to the Plaintiffs Complaint is extended up to and through December 15, 2023, and Plaintiff David Ryan Wood shall have until January 19, 2024, to respond to any answer or Rule 12 motion filed by Defendants Rowan County, J. Travis Allen, Kevin Auten, Gregory Hannold, and Jerry Ewart. (Taylor, Abby)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for JOHN DOE CORPORATION/PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Answer due by 12/6/2023. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/6/2023. (Brubaker, John)
November 2, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Blay, Debbie)
November 1, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JAMES R. MORGAN, JR on behalf of Defendants J. TRAVIS ALLEN, KEVIN AUTEN, JERRY EWART, GREGORY HANNOLD, THE COUNTY OF ROWAN (MORGAN, JAMES)
November 1, 2023 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by J. TRAVIS ALLEN, KEVIN AUTEN, JERRY EWART, GREGORY HANNOLD, THE COUNTY OF ROWAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MORGAN, JAMES)
October 31, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to JACQUELIN MICHELE WILLIAMS. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/30/2023; that the Motion [Doc. #7 ] is GRANTED and Defendants Wellpath, LLC, Ashley Rowland, and Kevin John Corrigan are given an extension up to and including December 15, 2023 to answer, object, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 30, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Blay, Debbie)
October 27, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KEVIN JOHN CORRIGAN, ASHLEY ROWLAND, WELLPATH, LLC. (COOK, MEGAN)
October 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JENNIFER BRYANT MILAK on behalf of Defendants KEVIN JOHN CORRIGAN, ASHLEY ROWLAND, WELLPATH, LLC (MILAK, JENNIFER)
October 26, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MEGAN ELIZABETH COOK on behalf of Defendants KEVIN JOHN CORRIGAN, ASHLEY ROWLAND, WELLPATH, LLC (COOK, MEGAN) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/27/2023 with flattened document.) (Hicks, Samantha)
September 27, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
September 27, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - The County of Rowan, #2 Summons - J. Travis Allen, #3 Summons - Kevin Auten, #4 Summons - Gregory Hannold, #5 Summons - Officer Jerry Ewart, #6 Summons - Pennsylvania National Mutual Insurance Company, #7 Summons - Kevin John Corrigan, #8 Summons - Ashley Rowland, #9 Summons - Jacquelin Michele Williams, #10 Summons - Unknown Wellpath Providers) (Hicks, Samantha)
September 26, 2023 Case Assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Butler, Carol)
September 26, 2023 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Butler, Carol)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3659340.), filed by DAVID RYAN WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CNN Report)(ABRAMS, ELLIOT)
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ELLIOT S. ABRAMS on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID RYAN WOOD (ABRAMS, ELLIOT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOOD v. WELLPATH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID RYAN WOOD
Represented By: ELLIOT S. ABRAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLPATH, LLC
Represented By: JENNIFER BRYANT MILAK
Represented By: MEGAN ELIZABETH COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COUNTY OF ROWAN
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. TRAVIS ALLEN
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN AUTEN
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY HANNOLD
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. JERRY EWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION/PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: NED A. STILES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN JOHN CORRIGAN
Represented By: JENNIFER BRYANT MILAK
Represented By: MEGAN ELIZABETH COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY ROWLAND
Represented By: JENNIFER BRYANT MILAK
Represented By: MEGAN ELIZABETH COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELIN MICHELE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN WELLPATH PROVIDER(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JERRY EWART
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?