NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY et al v. NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY and DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, KAREN BRINSON BELL, ALAN HIRSCH, JEFF CARMON, STACY EGGERS IV, KEVIN N. LEWIS and SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN
Intervenor Defendant: PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, VIRGINIA A. WASSERBERG and BRENDA M. ELDRIDGE
Case Number: 1:2023cv00862
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument Hearing set for 12/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (ae)
December 5, 2023 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (ae)
December 4, 2023 Filing 58 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY, to Response to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Consolidated Reply to Responses of Intervenors and State Board Defendants filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. (PHILLIPS, JIM)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/1/2023; that Plaintiffs have leave to file one omnibus reply in support of their motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. #6 ), not to exceed 4,000 words in length. (sh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 56 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Reply Brief and for Relief from Word Count Limitation by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. Response to Motion due by 12/22/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
December 1, 2023 Motion Submitted: #56 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Reply Brief and for Relief from Word Count Limitation to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (km)
November 21, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ALEXANDRA M. BRADLEY on behalf of Intervenor Defendants PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE (BRADLEY, ALEXANDRA)
November 20, 2023 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Counsel filed by Defendants KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, STACY EGGERS IV, ALAN HIRSCH, KEVIN N. LEWIS, SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS re #53 Response to Motion,, filed by KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, STACY EGGERS IV, ALAN HIRSCH, KEVIN N. LEWIS, SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - North Carolina Voter Registration Application, #2 Exhibit B - Numbered Memo 2016-15, #3 Exhibit C - Numbered Memo 2022-05, #4 Exhibit D - Numbered Memo 2018-07)(STEED, TERENCE)
November 20, 2023 Filing 53 RESPONSE filed by Defendants KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, STACY EGGERS IV, ALAN HIRSCH, KEVIN N. LEWIS, SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY, DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE filed by KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, STACY EGGERS IV, ALAN HIRSCH, KEVIN N. LEWIS, SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. Replies due by 12/4/2023 (STEED, TERENCE)
November 20, 2023 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE. Replies due by 12/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Numbered Memo 2016-15)(STRACH, PHILLIP) Modified on 11/21/2023 to correct docket text. (lg)
November 20, 2023 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by BRENDA M. ELDRIDGE, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, VIRGINIA A. WASSERBERG. Replies due by 12/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NCSBE Press Release)(THOMAS, PHILIP) Modified on 11/21/2023 to correct docket text. (lg)
November 15, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Status Conference held on 11/15/2023. Attorney Seth Waxman present as counsel for the plaintiff. Attorneys Mary Babb and Terence Steed present as counsel for Defendants. Attorney Phillip Strach present as counsel for Intervenors. Parties agree response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Doc. #6 due 11/20/2023. Parties shall stay within the page/word limitations pursuant to the L.R., if more is needed the appropriate motion should be filed. Answer to complaint due 1/16/2024. (Court Reporter Briana Chesnut.) (rw) Modified on 11/15/2023 to include word limitation (rw). Modified on 12/5/2023 to correct Answer due date. (ae)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/13/2023; that a status conference is hereby scheduled for November 15, 2023, at 3:00 p.m., in Winston-Salem, Courtroom # 1, at which time the court will take up the various concerns raised in the motions. (sh)
November 13, 2023 Motion Submitted: #49 MOTION for a Status Conference (Unopposed) to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (km)
November 13, 2023 Set Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/15/2023 03:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1. (sh)
November 12, 2023 Filing 49 MOTION for a Status Conference (Unopposed) by KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, STACY EGGERS IV, ALAN HIRSCH, KEVIN N. LEWIS, SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STEED, TERENCE)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/06/2023, that the Movants' motion to expedite (Doc. #39 ) is GRANTED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Movants' motion to intervene (Doc. #35 ) is GRANTED. (Bowers, Alexis)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/3/2023; that the Legislative Leaders' motion to expedite (Doc. #38 ) is GRANTED, and FURTHER ORDERED that the Legislative Leaders' motion to intervene (Doc. #31 ) is GRANTED. (Hicks, Samantha)
November 3, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney TREVOR M. STANLEY on behalf of Intervenor Defendants BRENDA M. ELDRIDGE, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, VIRGINIA A. WASSERBERG ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3691146.) (STANLEY, TREVOR)
November 3, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PATRICK T LEWIS on behalf of Intervenor Defendants BRENDA M. ELDRIDGE, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, VIRGINIA A. WASSERBERG ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3690964.) (LEWIS, PATRICK)
November 2, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney RICHARD BRYAN RAILE on behalf of Intervenor Defendants BRENDA M. ELDRIDGE, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, VIRGINIA A. WASSERBERG ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3690074.) (RAILE, RICHARD)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/2/2023; that Defendants shall have up to and including November 16, 2023, to file a response to Plaintiffs' complaint and motion for preliminary injunction. (Hicks, Samantha)
November 2, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney RACHEL PALMER HOOPER on behalf of Intervenor Defendants BRENDA M. ELDRIDGE, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, VIRGINIA A. WASSERBERG ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3689753.) (HOOPER, RACHEL)
November 2, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney TYLER GEOFFREY DOYLE on behalf of Intervenor Defendants BRENDA M. ELDRIDGE, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, VIRGINIA A. WASSERBERG ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3689712.) (DOYLE, TYLER)
November 2, 2023 Answer updated for All Defendants. Answer due 11/16/2023. (Hicks, Samantha)
November 1, 2023 Filing 40 RESPONSE re Order, (Text Order ECF No. 39) filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
November 1, 2023 Motions Submitted: #38 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Intervene and #39 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Intervene to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Marsh, Keah)
November 1, 2023 Motion Submitted: #37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint (Unopposed Motion) to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Marsh, Keah)
October 31, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Intervene by BRENDA M. ELDRIDGE, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, VIRGINIA A. WASSERBERG. (THOMAS, PHILIP)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 10/31/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff shall indicate whether they intend to file a response to #38 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Intervene no later than 5pm on Wednesday, November 1, 2023. (Marsh, Keah)
October 30, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Intervene by PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE. (STRACH, PHILLIP)
October 30, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint (Unopposed Motion) by KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, STACY EGGERS IV, ALAN HIRSCH, KEVIN N. LEWIS, SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STEED, TERENCE)
October 26, 2023 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM re #35 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants Brenda M. Eldridge, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, Virginia A. Wasserberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stein Statement in Opposition to SB747)(THOMAS, PHILIP)
October 26, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Intervene by Brenda M. Eldridge, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, Virginia A. Wasserberg. Response to Motion due by 11/16/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Answer)(THOMAS, PHILIP)
October 26, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney PHILIP R THOMAS on behalf of Intervenor Defendants REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY, Virginia A. Wasserberg, Brenda M. Eldridge (THOMAS, PHILIP)
October 23, 2023 Answer updated for All Defendants to 11/2/2023. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 20, 2023 Filing 33 Declaration of Proof of Service served on All Defendants on October 12, 2023, filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Alan Hirsch c/o Paul Cox, #3 Exhibit B - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Alan Hirsch c/o Sarah Boyce, #4 Exhibit C - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Jeff Carmon c/o Paul Cox, #5 Exhibit D - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Jeff Carmon c/o Sarah Boyce, #6 Exhibit E - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Karen Brinson Bell c/o Paul Cox, #7 Exhibit F - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Karen Brinson Bell c/o Sarah Boyce, #8 Exhibit G - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Kevin N. Lewis c/o Paul Cox, #9 Exhibit H - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Kevin N. Lewis c/o Sarah Boyce, #10 Exhibit I - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for North Carolina State Board of Elections c/o Paul Cox, #11 Exhibit J - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for North Carolina State Board of Elections c/o Sarah Boyce, #12 Exhibit K - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Siobhan ODuffy Millen c/o Paul Cox, #13 Exhibit L - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Siobhan ODuffy Millen c/o Sarah Boyce, #14 Exhibit M - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Stacy Eggers IV c/o Paul Cox, #15 Exhibit N - FedEx Delivery Confirmation for Stacy Eggers IV c/o Sarah Boyce)(ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
October 16, 2023 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Defendants PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE re #31 MOTION to Intervene filed by PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stein Tweet on S.B. 747, #2 Exhibit 2 - Stein Press Release, #3 Exhibit 3 - February 13, 2023 Letter)(STRACH, PHILLIP)
October 16, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Intervene by PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE. Response to Motion due by 11/6/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Answer)(STRACH, PHILLIP)
October 16, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CASSIE A. HOLT on behalf of Intervenor Defendants PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE (HOLT, CASSIE)
October 16, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ALYSSA M. RIGGINS on behalf of Intervenor Defendants PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE (RIGGINS, ALYSSA)
October 16, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney THOMAS A. FARR on behalf of Intervenor Defendants PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE (FARR, THOMAS)
October 16, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney PHILLIP JOHN STRACH on behalf of Intervenor Defendants PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE (STRACH, PHILLIP)
October 13, 2023 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (STEED, TERENCE)
October 13, 2023 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (STEED, TERENCE)
October 13, 2023 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (STEED, TERENCE)
October 13, 2023 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (STEED, TERENCE)
October 13, 2023 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (STEED, TERENCE)
October 13, 2023 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (STEED, TERENCE)
October 13, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (STEED, TERENCE)
October 13, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney TERENCE P. STEED on behalf of Defendants KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, STACY EGGERS IV, ALAN HIRSCH, KEVIN N. LEWIS, SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS (STEED, TERENCE)
October 13, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MARY CARLA BABB on behalf of Defendants KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, STACY EGGERS IV, ALAN HIRSCH, KEVIN N. LEWIS, SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS (BABB, MARY)
October 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY re #1 Complaint Notice of Filing Exhibit A to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Senate Bill 747)(ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
October 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney GARY M. FOX on behalf of Plaintiffs DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3670741.) (FOX, GARY)
October 11, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JOSEPH MEYER on behalf of Plaintiffs DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3670738.) (MEYER, JOSEPH)
October 11, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER BABBITT on behalf of Plaintiffs DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3670731.) (BABBITT, CHRISTOPHER)
October 11, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney DANIEL VOLCHOK on behalf of Plaintiffs DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3670721.) (VOLCHOK, DANIEL)
October 11, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney SETH P. WAXMAN on behalf of Plaintiffs DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3670710.) (WAXMAN, SETH)
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent to jurisdiction) (Lee, Ashley)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Hirsch, #2 Summons issued to Cannon, #3 Summons issued to Cannon address 2, #4 Summons issued to Bell, #5 Summons issued to Bell address 2, #6 Summons issued to Lewis, #7 Summons issued to Lewis address 2, #8 Summons issued to NCSBE, #9 Summons issued to NCSBE 2, #10 Summons issued to Millen, #11 Summons issued to Millen address 2, #12 Summons issued to Eggers IV, #13 Summons issued to Eggers IV address 2) (Lee, Ashley)
October 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY re #7 Brief, Certificate of Word Count (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JAMES WELDON WHALEN on behalf of Plaintiffs DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY (WHALEN, JAMES) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/11/2023 with flattened document.) (Hicks, Samantha)
October 11, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Lee, Ashley)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 BRIEF re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. Response to Motion due by 10/31/2023 (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SHANA L. FULTON on behalf of Plaintiffs DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY (FULTON, SHANA)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JIM W. PHILLIPS, JR on behalf of Plaintiff DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. (PHILLIPS, JIM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/11/2023 with flattened document and entry modified to include both parties represented by attorney.) (Hicks, Samantha)
October 10, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
October 10, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)
October 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3669710.), filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY.(ROBERTSON, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY et al v. NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Represented By: JAMES WELDON WHALEN
Represented By: SETH P. WAXMAN
Represented By: SHANA L. FULTON
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ROBERTSON
Represented By: DANIEL VOLCHOK
Represented By: JOSEPH MEYER
Represented By: GARY M. FOX
Represented By: JIM W. PHILLIPS, JR.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BABBITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: GARY M. FOX
Represented By: JAMES WELDON WHALEN
Represented By: JOSEPH MEYER
Represented By: SHANA L. FULTON
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ROBERTSON
Represented By: JIM W. PHILLIPS, JR.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BABBITT
Represented By: DANIEL VOLCHOK
Represented By: SETH P. WAXMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: MARY CARLA BABB
Represented By: TERENCE P. STEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN BRINSON BELL
Represented By: TERENCE P. STEED
Represented By: MARY CARLA BABB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN HIRSCH
Represented By: MARY CARLA BABB
Represented By: TERENCE P. STEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF CARMON
Represented By: MARY CARLA BABB
Represented By: TERENCE P. STEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACY EGGERS IV
Represented By: MARY CARLA BABB
Represented By: TERENCE P. STEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN N. LEWIS
Represented By: MARY CARLA BABB
Represented By: TERENCE P. STEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIOBHAN O'DUFFY MILLEN
Represented By: MARY CARLA BABB
Represented By: TERENCE P. STEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: PHILIP E. BERGER
Represented By: PHILLIP JOHN STRACH
Represented By: ALEXANDRA M. BRADLEY
Represented By: ALYSSA M. RIGGINS
Represented By: CASSIE A. HOLT
Represented By: THOMAS A. FARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: TIMOTHY K. MOORE
Represented By: PHILLIP JOHN STRACH
Represented By: ALEXANDRA M. BRADLEY
Represented By: ALYSSA M. RIGGINS
Represented By: CASSIE A. HOLT
Represented By: THOMAS A. FARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: RICHARD BRYAN RAILE
Represented By: TREVOR M. STANLEY
Represented By: PHILIP R THOMAS
Represented By: RACHEL PALMER HOOPER
Represented By: TYLER GEOFFREY DOYLE
Represented By: PATRICK T LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NORTH CAROLINA REPUBLICAN PARTY
Represented By: RICHARD BRYAN RAILE
Represented By: TYLER GEOFFREY DOYLE
Represented By: PHILIP R THOMAS
Represented By: RACHEL PALMER HOOPER
Represented By: PATRICK T LEWIS
Represented By: TREVOR M. STANLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: VIRGINIA A. WASSERBERG
Represented By: PATRICK T LEWIS
Represented By: TREVOR M. STANLEY
Represented By: PHILIP R THOMAS
Represented By: RACHEL PALMER HOOPER
Represented By: RICHARD BRYAN RAILE
Represented By: TYLER GEOFFREY DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: BRENDA M. ELDRIDGE
Represented By: TREVOR M. STANLEY
Represented By: PHILIP R THOMAS
Represented By: PATRICK T LEWIS
Represented By: RACHEL PALMER HOOPER
Represented By: RICHARD BRYAN RAILE
Represented By: TYLER GEOFFREY DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?