MCCLENDON et al v. TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ALANA MCCLENDON, CASEY OXENDINE, DENISE PARKER MOORE, EARLYN FERNANDEZ, ELIZABETH MILLER, ERIC KUYKENDALL, GIORJO HABTEMARIAM, HARRY WILLIAMS, KEISHA PIERCE MCPHATTER, LATOSHA GADDIE, BARRY GADDIE, LEQUINCY CHANDLER, NYEMEKIA MUNN, PRISCILLA COVINGTON, SABRINA HOWIE, SHANRECA WRAY, TANGELLA LONG, TERESA BAKER, TIMOTHY MASON and VICTORIA JACKSON SMITH
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC. and TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00865
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 TEXT ORDER Granting #22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Based on the representations to the Court and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiffs' Response deadline to the Motion to Dismiss will be reset after the Court enters a ruling on jurisdictional discovery. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 12/8/2023.(pl)
December 3, 2023 Motions Referred: RE: #20 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional), #22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (km)
November 22, 2023 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff ALANA MCCLENDON, to Response to #20 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by ALANA MCCLENDON. (BROWN, ANDREW)
November 21, 2023 Reset Reply Deadline re: #20 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional): Replies due by 11/27/2023. (lg)
November 20, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. Replies due by 11/27/2023. (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 11/21/2023 to correct Reply deadline from 12/4/2023 to 11/27/2023. (lg)
November 6, 2023 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TERESA BAKER, LEQUINCY CHANDLER, PRISCILLA COVINGTON, EARLYN FERNANDEZ, BARRY GADDIE, LATOSHA GADDIE, GIORJO HABTEMARIAM, SABRINA HOWIE, ERIC KUYKENDALL, TANGELLA LONG, TIMOTHY MASON, ALANA MCCLENDON, KEISHA PIERCE MCPHATTER, ELIZABETH MILLER, DENISE PARKER MOORE, NYEMEKIA MUNN, CASEY OXENDINE, VICTORIA JACKSON SMITH, HARRY WILLIAMS, SHANRECA WRAY. (BROWN, ANDREW)
November 6, 2023 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff ALANA MCCLENDON re #20 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by ALANA MCCLENDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(BROWN, ANDREW)
November 6, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) by ALANA MCCLENDON. Response to Motion due by 11/20/2023 (BROWN, ANDREW)
October 26, 2023 ORAL ORDER issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/26/23 at motion hearing in case 19cv489, granting Oral Motion to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference currently set for 11/21/23 until further notice. (Garrett, Kim)
October 26, 2023 Oral Motion made by both parties at Motion Hearing in case 19cv489 on 10/26/23 with Judge Webster to continue Initial Pretrial Conference in this matter currently set for 11/21/23 in Durham until ruling on dispositive motions.. (Garrett, Kim)
October 23, 2023 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs Subject to Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Christopher Dunn)(WOODROW, THOMAS)
October 23, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2023 (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 10/24/2023 to complete pleading title. (Bowers, Alexis)
October 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/21/2023 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
October 18, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #13 Complaint, by TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
October 13, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction) (Garland, Leah)
October 13, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 23CVS7722, issued 9/5/2023, filed at D.E. #12 Additional Attachment to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
October 13, 2023 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 23CVS7722, filed as Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Petition for Removal. (WOODROW, THOMAS)
October 12, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney LAUREN TALLENT on behalf of Defendants TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3671497.) (TALLENT, LAUREN)
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ANTHONY DURONE on behalf of Defendants TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3671476.) (DURONE, ANTHONY)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney STACEY GILMAN on behalf of Defendants TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3671446.) (GILMAN, STACEY)
October 12, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Lee, Ashley)
October 12, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Lee, Ashley)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE HOLDINGS, INC. for TMX FINANCE LLC. (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 10/13/2023 to remove unnecessary punctuation. (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE, LLC for TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 10/13/2023 to remove unnecessary punctuation. (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE, LLC for TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 10/13/2023 to remove unnecessary punctuation. (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE, LLC for TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 10/13/2023 to remove unnecessary punctuation. (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE, LLC for TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 10/13/2023 to remove unnecessary punctuation. (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TMX FINANCE LLC for TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC. (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 10/13/2023 to remove unnecessary punctuation. (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney THOMAS R. WOODROW on behalf of Defendants TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC (WOODROW, THOMAS)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3670499.)(Related Case # 23-cv-246, 23-cv-34, 23-cv-408, 23-cv-589, 22-cv-971), filed by TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC., TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC., TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., TMX FINANCE LLC, TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC., TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC., TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (WOODROW, THOMAS) Modified on 10/13/2023 to remove duplicate text. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLENDON et al v. TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALANA MCCLENDON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASEY OXENDINE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE PARKER MOORE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARLYN FERNANDEZ
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH MILLER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC KUYKENDALL
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIORJO HABTEMARIAM
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY WILLIAMS
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEISHA PIERCE MCPHATTER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATOSHA GADDIE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY GADDIE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEQUINCY CHANDLER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYEMEKIA MUNN
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRISCILLA COVINGTON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRINA HOWIE
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANRECA WRAY
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANGELLA LONG
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA BAKER
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MASON
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA JACKSON SMITH
Represented By: ANDREW H. R. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF VIRGINIA, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMX FINANCE LLC
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMX FINANCE OF VIRGINIA, INC
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMX FINANCE OF TENNESSEE, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF TENNESSEE, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLEMAX OF GEORGIA, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. WOODROW
Represented By: STACEY GILMAN
Represented By: ANTHONY DURONE
Represented By: LAUREN TALLENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?