LAMBERT v. UNKNOWN OFFICIALS
Plaintiff: BRANSON LAMBERT
Defendant: UNKNOWN OFFICIALS
Case Number: 1:2023cv00948
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 12/6/2023. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 12/11/2023. (lg)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 11/22/2023, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint or petition, on the proper forms, which corrects the defects cited above. (lg)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 11/22/2023, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. (lg)
November 3, 2023 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Butler, Carol)
November 2, 2023 Case Assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Butler, Carol)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNKNOWN OFFICIALS, filed by BRANSON LAMBERT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Butler, Carol) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/2/2023) (Butler, Carol).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAMBERT v. UNKNOWN OFFICIALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANSON LAMBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OFFICIALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?