VAUGHN v. NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Plaintiff: CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR
Defendant: NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Case Number: 1:2023cv00975
Filed: November 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE to file Amended Remand by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (at)
December 28, 2023 Filing 22 LETTER NOTICE by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (ab)
December 28, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR filed by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. Replies due by 1/11/2024 (HORNE, JAMES)
December 28, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR filed by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. Replies due by 1/11/2024 (HORNE, JAMES)
December 28, 2023 Filing 18 Roseboro Letter regarding right to respond to pldg #16 . (ab)
December 28, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (HORNE, JAMES)
December 27, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE entitled "Expressing the Trust Special Deposit" by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope - Front and Back) (ab)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Am. Compl.)(HORNE, JAMES)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 Pro Se Letter NOTICE by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Envelope - Front and Back) (ab)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint & Motion for Clarification of Operative Pleading by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HORNE, JAMES)
December 14, 2023 Reset Motion and R and R Deadline re #11 MOTION to Dismiss : Response due 12/20/2023. (ab)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment, Acquiescence as to by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4)(ab)
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION entitled "Notice of Filing Remand" by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2024. (ab)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION entitled "Plaintiff's Notice to Moot the Motion to Dismiss and File Amended Complaint for Permanent Injunctive and Other Equitable Relief" by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. Response to Motion due by 12/20/2023. (ab) Modified on 12/14/2023 to correct response deadline from 01/02/2024 to 12/20/2023. (ab)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 Letter NOTICE by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (ab)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/04/2023, that Plaintiff must file his Amended Complaint with this Court by December 8, 2023. If the Amended Complaint is not filed by December 8, 2023, the case will proceed on the original Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Navy Federal's Motion [Doc. #8 ] for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint or Amended Complaint is GRANTED; and Defendant Navy Federal shall file its responsive pleadings no later than December 20, 2023. (at)
November 30, 2023 Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (jd)
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(HORNE, JAMES)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent to jurisdiction)(al)
November 16, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (al)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. JAMES DAVID HORNE, JR is substituted as counsel for Defendant. Attorney D. KYLE DEAK terminated. (HORNE, JAMES)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to TIMOTHY ROSSON on 10/09/2023. (State court Documents originally filed in Durham County Civil Court, Case number 23CVD3813, Listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Lee, Ashley)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR, filed by KYLE DEAK (State court Documents originally filed in Durham County Civil Court, Case number 23CVD3813, Listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(al)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE to State Court of Filing Petition for Removal by Defendant NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(DEAK, D.)
November 13, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (DEAK, D.)
November 13, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Durham County Civil Court case number 23CVD3813 against CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3696970.), filed by NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(DEAK, D.) Modified to add State court information on 11/15/2023 (al).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAUGHN v. NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Represented By: D. KYLE DEAK
Represented By: JAMES DAVID HORNE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?