HOLCIM (US) INC. v. PYRTLE et al
Plaintiff: HOLCIM (US) INC.
Defendant: GREGORY K. PYRTLE, PYRTLE VENTURES LLC and CARSON INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01019
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (HILSTON, HENRY)
December 29, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (FERGUSON, THOMAS)
December 28, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by GREGORY K. PYRTLE, PYRTLE VENTURES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ARCHER, CHAD)
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney HENRY O. HILSTON on behalf of Defendants GREGORY K. PYRTLE, PYRTLE VENTURES LLC (HILSTON, HENRY)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHAD A. ARCHER on behalf of Defendants GREGORY K. PYRTLE, PYRTLE VENTURES LLC (ARCHER, CHAD)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (or otherwise respond) by CARSON INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FERGUSON, THOMAS)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CARSON INDUSTRIES, INC. Answer due by 2/2/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/28/2023. (jsb)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for GREGORY K. PYRTLE and PYRTLE VENTURES LLC. Answer due by 2/2/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/28/2023. (jsb)
December 22, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CARSON INDUSTRIES, INC. served on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024. (NANNEY, JOSEPH)
December 19, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to PYRTLE VENTURES LLC served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (NANNEY, JOSEPH)
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to GREGORY K. PYRTLE served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (NANNEY, JOSEPH)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Holcim Participations (US) Inc., Other Affiliate Holcim Ltd. for HOLCIM (US) INC... (YERBY, JOHN)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent to jurisdiction) (al)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 summons issued to Gregory pyrtle, #2 summons issued Pyrtle ventures) (al)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN B TYMANN on behalf of Plaintiff HOLCIM (US) INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3707701.) (TYMANN, BENJAMIN)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JOHN PATRICK YERBY on behalf of Plaintiff HOLCIM (US) INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3707681.) (YERBY, JOHN)
November 27, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (al)
November 22, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (al)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3704165), filed by HOLCIM (US) INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Maintenance Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Maintenance Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Price Sheet, #4 Exhibit D Invoices, #5 Exhibit E Skyjack Invoice)(NANNEY, JOSEPH) Modified on 11/21/2023 to remove duplicate text and remove unnecessary punctuation. (lg) Modified to add wording to title on 11/21/2023 (al).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLCIM (US) INC. v. PYRTLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLCIM (US) INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH H. NANNEY, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN B TYMANN
Represented By: JOHN PATRICK YERBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY K. PYRTLE
Represented By: CHAD A. ARCHER
Represented By: HENRY O. HILSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYRTLE VENTURES LLC
Represented By: CHAD A. ARCHER
Represented By: HENRY O. HILSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARSON INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. FERGUSON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?