LEWIS v. EAGLES
Plaintiff: BRANDON RASHAD LEWIS
Defendant: JUDGE CATHERINE EAGLES
Case Number: 1:2023cv01027
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Prisoner Bivens Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 12/27/2023. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 1/2/2024. (at)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/13/2023, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper forms, which corrects the defects cited above. (at)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/13/2023, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. re #2 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #1 Complaint filed by BRANDON RASHAD LEWIS. (at)
November 29, 2023 CASE REFERRED for Screening (cb)
November 29, 2023 Case Assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (cb)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CATHERINE EAGLES, filed by BRANDON RASHAD LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(cb) Modified on 11/27/2023 to reflect received on 10/30/23. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. EAGLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON RASHAD LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE CATHERINE EAGLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?