TEDESCO et al v. SPOONFLOWER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SHARON TEDESCO and MARC TEDESCO
Defendant: SPOONFLOWER, INC. and SHUTTERFLY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01030
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants SHUTTERFLY, LLC, SPOONFLOWER, INC. re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SHUTTERFLY, LLC, SPOONFLOWER, INC.. (PRENDERGAST, MICHELLE)
January 25, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SHUTTERFLY, LLC, SPOONFLOWER, INC.. Response to Motion due by 2/15/2024 (PRENDERGAST, MICHELLE)
January 25, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendants SHUTTERFLY, LLC, SPOONFLOWER, INC. (PRENDERGAST, MICHELLE)
January 25, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney SASHA G. RAO on behalf of Defendants SHUTTERFLY, LLC, SPOONFLOWER, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3748359.) (RAO, SASHA)
December 26, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent SHUTTERFLY, LLC, Other Affiliate Snapfish, LLC, Other Affiliate Photo Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Sherwood Holdings II LLC for SPOONFLOWER, INC... (PRENDERGAST, MICHELLE)
December 26, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Snapfish, LLC, Other Affiliate Photo Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Sherwood Holdings II LLC for SHUTTERFLY, LLC.. (PRENDERGAST, MICHELLE)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by SHUTTERFLY, LLC, SPOONFLOWER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PRENDERGAST, MICHELLE)
December 21, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MICHELLE CHRISTINE PRENDERGAST on behalf of Defendants SHUTTERFLY, LLC, SPOONFLOWER, INC. (PRENDERGAST, MICHELLE)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for SHUTTERFLY, LLC and SPOONFLOWER, INC. Answer due by 1/25/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/21/2023. (jsb)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHARON TEDESCO, MARC TEDESCO as to SHUTTERFLY, LLC served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (OLIVE, SUSAN)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHARON TEDESCO, MARC TEDESCO as to SPOONFLOWER, INC. served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. on Proof of Service Spoonflower, Inc. by its corporate agent (OLIVE, SUSAN)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent to jurisdiction)(al)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Shutterfly)(al)
December 1, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (al)
December 1, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (al)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SUSAN FREYA OLIVE on behalf of Plaintiffs MARC TEDESCO, SHARON TEDESCO (OLIVE, SUSAN)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (OLIVE, SUSAN) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/29/2023 with flattened image.) (sh)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (OLIVE, SUSAN) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/29/2023 with flattened image.) (sh)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR WILLFUL PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3709117.), filed by SHARON TEDESCO, MARC TEDESCO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 7,310,885, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent 7,409,769, #3 Exhibit C - Fabric Samples Sold by Spoonflower to Mrs. Tedesco, #4 Exhibit C - Infringing Fabric as Currently Promoted by Defendants, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(OLIVE, SUSAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEDESCO et al v. SPOONFLOWER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON TEDESCO
Represented By: SUSAN FREYA OLIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC TEDESCO
Represented By: SUSAN FREYA OLIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPOONFLOWER, INC.
Represented By: MICHELLE CHRISTINE PRENDERGAST
Represented By: SASHA G. RAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHUTTERFLY, LLC
Represented By: MICHELLE CHRISTINE PRENDERGAST
Represented By: SASHA G. RAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?