VAUGHN v. DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR
Defendant: DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC and BRIAN D. SAVOY
Case Number: 1:2023cv01031
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 - Petition for Removal: SEC Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Defendants DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC, BRIAN D. SAVOY re #21 Notice (Other) filed by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR filed by DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC, BRIAN D. SAVOY. Replies due by 1/26/2024 (HERNDON, ROBERT)
January 2, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE entitled "Notice to File Amended Remand" filed by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Subrogation and Substitution, #2 Envelope - Front and Back) (lg)
December 28, 2023 Filing 20 LETTER NOTICE by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (ab)
December 27, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE entitled "BILL OF COMPLAINT IN EQUITY PRESENTMENT TO VOID PROCEEDINGS AND JURISDICTION" by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (sh)
December 27, 2023 Filing 18 Roseboro Letter re #16 Motion to Dimiss. (sh)
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC, BRIAN D. SAVOY re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC, BRIAN D. SAVOY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bethea v. Gold (unpublished opinion), #2 Exhibit El-Bey v. City of Greensboro (unpublished opinion), #3 Exhibit Shaver v. Cooleemee Volunteer Fire Dept (unpublished opinion), #4 Exhibit Siler-El v. Duke Energy Corporation (unpublished opinion))(HERNDON, ROBERT)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC, BRIAN D. SAVOY. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2024 (HERNDON, ROBERT)
December 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ETHAN ANDREW JOHNSON on behalf of Defendant BRIAN D. SAVOY (JOHNSON, ETHAN)
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ROBERT J. HERNDON on behalf of Defendant BRIAN D. SAVOY (HERNDON, ROBERT)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 Pro Se Letter NOTICE by CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Envelope - Front and Back) (ab)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/4/2023; that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #11 ] is GRANTED, and Defendant Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC shall have through and including December 27, 2023 within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (sh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint by DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HERNDON, ROBERT)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (al)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent to jurisdiction)(al)
December 1, 2023 Motion Referred: RE: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (db)
December 1, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (al)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Reissued on 11/16/2023 as to all Defendants (State court document originally filed in Durham County, Case number 23CVD3669, issued 11/6/2023, listed as Exhibit B to the #1 Petition for Removal) (al) Modified on 12/4/2023 to correct docket text. (lg)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT- Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (State court document originally filed in Durham County, Case number 23CVD3669, listed as Exhibit B to the #1 Petition for Removal) (al) Modified on 12/4/2023 to correct docket text. (lg)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued filed on 9/19/2023 as to All Defendants (State court document originally filed in Durham County, Case number 23CVD3669, issued 9/19/2023, listed as Exhibit B to the #1 Petition for Removal) (al) Modified on 12/4/2023 to correct docket text. (lg)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT- Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Carl Vaughn Jr. (State court document originally filed in Durham County, Case number 23CVD3669, listed as Exhibit B to the #1 Petition for Removal)(al) Modified on 12/4/2023 to correct docket text. (lg)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ETHAN ANDREW JOHNSON on behalf of Defendant Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC (JOHNSON, ETHAN)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION for Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC.. (HERNDON, ROBERT)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ROBERT J. HERNDON on behalf of Defendant Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC (HERNDON, ROBERT)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BNCMDC-3709329.), filed by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Initial State Court Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Revised State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Revised State Court Filing, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Motion to Dismiss, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(HERNDON, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAUGHN v. DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL DAVIS VAUGHN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC
Represented By: ETHAN ANDREW JOHNSON
Represented By: ROBERT J. HERNDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN D. SAVOY
Represented By: ETHAN ANDREW JOHNSON
Represented By: ROBERT J. HERNDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?