SACKS HOLDINGS, INC. v. GRIN NATURAL USA LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: SACKS HOLDINGS, INC.
Defendant: GRIN NATURAL USA LIMITED, GRIN NATURAL US LIMITED, GRIN HOLDINGS LIMITED, VGRIN NATURAL PRODUCTS LIMITED and GRIN NATURAL PRODUCTS AUSTRALIA PTY
Case Number: 1:2023cv01058
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel on behalf of All Defendants on 12/22/2023. (WHARTON, JACOB)
December 13, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent to jurisdiction) (al)
December 13, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 summons issued to Grin Natural US, #2 summons issued to Grin Natural Australia, #3 summons issued to Grin limited Subpoena, #4 summons issued to Grin Natural USA Limited)(al)
December 6, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (al)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Sacks Holdings, Inc. (WHARTON, JACOB) Modified on 12/5/2023 to correct docket text. (lg)
December 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3713958.), filed by Sacks Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Trademark Reg. No. 6,273,196, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Trademark Reg. No. 7,058,028, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Trademark Appl'n No. 98271890, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter 20 June 2020, #5 Exhibit 5 - Grin Natural Invoice (REDACTED))(WHARTON, JACOB) Modified on 12/5/2023 to remove duplicate text and unnecessary punctuation. (lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SACKS HOLDINGS, INC. v. GRIN NATURAL USA LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SACKS HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: JACOB STEVEN WHARTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRIN NATURAL USA LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRIN NATURAL US LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRIN HOLDINGS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGRIN NATURAL PRODUCTS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRIN NATURAL PRODUCTS AUSTRALIA PTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?