WILLS v. EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP.
Plaintiff: JAMES L. WILLS, IV
Defendant: EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP., TRANS UNION LLC and EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00114
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Filing 18 Roseboro Letter re: #15 Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2024. (cc)
March 27, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF WORD COUNT by EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP. re #16 Memorandum, (ENLOE, CAREN) Modified on 3/28/2024 to rename title of Docket Entry. (cc)
March 27, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP., TRANS UNION LLC re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP., TRANS UNION LLC. (ENLOE, CAREN)
March 27, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP., TRANS UNION LLC. (ENLOE, CAREN)
March 26, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC. for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.. (GOEMANN, ETHAN)
March 26, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ETHAN C. GOEMANN on behalf of Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (GOEMANN, ETHAN)
March 5, 2024 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time and #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants TRANS UNION LLC and EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP. (collectively, Defendants) shall answer or otherwise respond to this action by 03/27/2024. In #9 Motion and #10 Motion, counsel for Defendants sought a 30-day extension of time to properly investigate the claims in #4 Complaint and [8-2] Complaint. In those filings, Plaintiff invoked roughly a half-dozen, federal statutory provisions in connection with vague allegations about his credit report. As pointed out in #10 Motion, to reasonably respond to such a pleading, counsel for Defendants, at a minimum, must "locate and assemble documents relating to Plaintiff's credit file, any disputes submitted by Plaintiff, and [any] reinvestigation of any such disputes." That sort of activity reasonably may require the additional time sought in #9 Motion and #10 Motion. In the face of that reality, Plaintiff has, in #12 Opposition, "express[ed his] firm opposition to any postponement of the scheduled proceedings." In Plaintiff's view, because he "ha[s] diligently prepared [his] case and [is] fully ready to present [his] arguments and evidence to the [C]ourt," the Court should deny any extension of time to Defendants. That view conflicts with the plain language of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), which permits timely requested extensions upon a showing of "good cause." The Court finds such good cause satisfied in this case. The Court also notes that Plaintiff has not alleged any concrete prejudice that this brief extension would cause, but instead relies on mere conclusory allegations that "[a]ny delay in the proceedings would not only be inconvenient for [him] but would also... caus[e] unnecessary hardship and inconvenience." Under these circumstances, the Court has exercised its discretion to grant the reasonable extension requested by Defendants. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/05/2024. (AULD, L.)
March 1, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff JAMES L. WILLS, IV re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Replies due by 3/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (sh)
February 27, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TRANSUNION, Corporate Parent TRANSUNION INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC., Other Affiliate T. ROWE PRICE GROUP, INC. for TRANS UNION LLC.. (KIRKLAND, MARC)
February 27, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint by TRANS UNION LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRKLAND, MARC)
February 27, 2024 TEXT ORDER (A) temporarily granting in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time, in that Defendant Trans Union LLC's time to answer or otherwise respond to this action is tolled, pending an expedited opportunity for Plaintiff to respond to #10 Motion; and (B) shortening the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to #10 Motion to 03/05/2024. In light of the shortened response time, the Clerk shall notify Plaintiff of this Text Order by telephone at the number he listed for himself on Page 3 of 4 Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 02/27/2024. (AULD, L.)
February 27, 2024 Telephone call held on 2/27/2024 to PLAINTIFF JAMES L. WILLS, IV. Plaintiff was advised of the shortened deadline to 3/5/2024 for him to have an opportunity to file a response to #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (at)
February 27, 2024 Set/Response Deadline re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint : Response to Motion due by 3/4/2024. (at)
February 27, 2024 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint. (ae)
February 27, 2024 Set/Response Deadline re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint : Response to Motion due by 3/5/2024. (at)
February 26, 2024 TEXT ORDER (A) temporarily granting in part #9 Motion for Extension of Time, in that Defendant Experian Services Corp.'s time to answer or otherwise respond to this action is tolled, pending an expedited opportunity for Plaintiff to respond to #9 Motion; and (B) shortening the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to #9 Motion to 03/04/2024. In light of the shortened response time, the Clerk shall notify Plaintiff of this Text Order by telephone at the number he listed for himself on Page 3 of #4 Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 02/26/2024. (AULD, L.)
February 26, 2024 Telephone call on 2/26/2024 to PLAINTIFF JAMES L. WILLS, IV. Plaintiff was advised of the shortened deadline to 3/4/2024 for him to have an opportunity to file a response to #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Address of Clerk's Office provided to Plaintiff. (ae)
February 22, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint by EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ENLOE, CAREN)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION for Removal, filed by EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action served on Experian, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Action served on TransUnion and Equifax, #3 Exhibit C - TransUnion's Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit D - Equifax's Consent to Removal)(ENLOE, CAREN)
February 22, 2024 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint. (ae)
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP. re #6 Notice of Right to Consent (ENLOE, CAREN)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent to jurisdiction)(al)
February 15, 2024 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (al)
February 14, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP. (State Court document originally filed in Durham County District Court, case number 24CVM675, issued 2/1/2024, listed as Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (lg)
February 14, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP., filed by JAMES L. WILLS, IV. (State Court document originally filed in Durham County District Court, case number 24CVM675, listed as Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (lg)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC for EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP. (ENLOE, CAREN) Modified on 2/14/2024 to remove duplicate punctuation. (lg)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CAREN D. ENLOE on behalf of Defendant EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP. (ENLOE, CAREN)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Durham County District Court, case number 24CVM675, against EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3764280.), filed by EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action)(ENLOE, CAREN) Modified on 2/14/2024 to add other court information. (lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLS v. EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES L. WILLS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN SERVICES CORP.
Represented By: CAREN D. ENLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION LLC
Represented By: MARC F. KIRKLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: ETHAN C. GOEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?