NANOFIBER FILTERS, LLC et al v. BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NANOFIBER FILTERS, LLC, NANOFIBER WIPERS, LLC and NANOFIBER APPLICATIONS, LLC
Defendant: BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC. and BERRY GLOBAL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00140
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. For good cause shown, Attorney David R. Ortiz shall be withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs Nanofiber Filters, LLC, Nanofiber Wipers, LLC, and Nanofiber Applications, LLC. Attorneys Kelsey I. Nix and Shameka C. Rolla of Smith, Anderson, Blount, Dorsett, Mitchell & Jernigan, L.L.P. shall remain as counsel for Plaintiffs. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 4/18/2024.(pl)
April 17, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DAVID RANSOM ORTIZ by on behalf of NANOFIBER APPLICATIONS, LLC, NANOFIBER FILTERS, LLC, NANOFIBER WIPERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ORTIZ, DAVID)
April 17, 2024 Motion Referred: RE: #14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DAVID RANSOM ORTIZ , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (db)
April 4, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SHAMEKA CAROLYNN ROLLA on behalf of Plaintiffs NANOFIBER APPLICATIONS, LLC, NANOFIBER FILTERS, LLC, NANOFIBER WIPERS, LLC (ROLLA, SHAMEKA)
March 27, 2024 Answer updated for All Defendants to 5/3/2024. (sh)
March 27, 2024 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Defendants. For good cause shown, Defendants shall have up to and including May 3, 2024, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 3/27/2024.(pl)
March 26, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KELSEY NIX on behalf of Plaintiffs NANOFIBER APPLICATIONS, LLC, NANOFIBER FILTERS, LLC, NANOFIBER WIPERS, LLC (NIX, KELSEY)
March 26, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC., BERRY GLOBAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LEACH, GLENN)
March 26, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LANCE A. LAWSON on behalf of Defendants BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC., BERRY GLOBAL, INC. (LAWSON, LANCE)
March 26, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney GLENN WADE LEACH, III on behalf of Defendants BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC., BERRY GLOBAL, INC. (LEACH, GLENN)
March 26, 2024 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR**STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation of Extension by BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC., BERRY GLOBAL, INC. (LEACH, GLENN) Modified on 3/26/2024 to mark filed in error. Attorneys to file motion and make appearances. (sh)
March 26, 2024 Motion Referred: RE: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (db)
March 13, 2024 Filing 7 Declaration of Proof of Service served on Berry Global Group, Inc. and Berry Global, Inc.. on 3/6/2024, filed by NANOFIBER APPLICATIONS, LLC, NANOFIBER FILTERS, LLC, NANOFIBER WIPERS, LLC. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delivery Receipt)(ORTIZ, DAVID)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction) (lg)
February 26, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC., BERRY GLOBAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued to Berry Global, Inc.) (lg)
February 26, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (lg)
February 26, 2024 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (lg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ORTIZ, DAVID)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ORTIZ, DAVID)
February 23, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ORTIZ, DAVID)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC., BERRY GLOBAL, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3770936.), filed by NANOFIBER FILTERS, LLC, NANOFIBER APPLICATIONS, LLC, NANOFIBER WIPERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - September 2023 Ltr, #2 Exhibit 2 - November 2023 Ltr)(ORTIZ, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NANOFIBER FILTERS, LLC et al v. BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANOFIBER FILTERS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID RANSOM ORTIZ
Represented By: KELSEY NIX
Represented By: SHAMEKA CAROLYNN ROLLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANOFIBER WIPERS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID RANSOM ORTIZ
Represented By: KELSEY NIX
Represented By: SHAMEKA CAROLYNN ROLLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANOFIBER APPLICATIONS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID RANSOM ORTIZ
Represented By: KELSEY NIX
Represented By: SHAMEKA CAROLYNN ROLLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: GLENN WADE LEACH, III
Represented By: LANCE A. LAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERRY GLOBAL, INC.
Represented By: GLENN WADE LEACH, III
Represented By: LANCE A. LAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?