ISHMAN v. SLOCUMB et al
Plaintiff: BRADLEY W. ISHMAN
Defendant: OFFICER SLOCUMB, LIEUTENANT THOMPSON, CAPTAIN THOMAS, OFFICER JACKSON, LIEUTENANT BLACKSHERE, OFFICER LACKEY, OFFICER HUNT, MAIL ROOM STAFF OFFICER SMITH, LIEUTENANT BRATCHER, LIEUTENANT FULTON and CORPORAL CHAVEZ
Case Number: 1:2024cv00188
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 04/29/2024, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. (lg)
April 29, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 5/13/2024. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 5/16/2024. (lg)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 04/29/2024, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited above. (lg)
March 11, 2024 Case Assigned to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (cb)
March 11, 2024 CASE REFERRED for Screening (cb)
March 6, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:24-ct-03055. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The court TRANSFERS the action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina where venue is proper. The court has neither conducted initial review of plaintiff's claims, nor reviewed plaintiff's pending motion to proceed without prepayment of fees, but the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina is better positioned to do so. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 3/6/2024. (Copy of order sent to plaintiff via US Mail.) (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/6/2024.]
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 Letter from Bradley Ishman informing the court that he sent his 1983 complaint to the wrong district. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/6/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 Letter regarding case opening sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/6/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 Incomplete Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bradley W. Ishman (Hardy, Shari) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/6/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Bradley W. Ishman. (Hardy, Shari) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/6/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lieutenant Blackshere, Lieutenant Bratcher, Corporal Chavez, Lieutenant Fulton, Officer Hunt, Officer Jackson, Officer Lackey, Officer Slocumb, Officer Smith, Captain Thomas, Lieutenant Thompson filed by Bradley W. Ishman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Hardy, Shari) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/6/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISHMAN v. SLOCUMB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY W. ISHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER SLOCUMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT BLACKSHERE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER LACKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER HUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAIL ROOM STAFF OFFICER SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT BRATCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT FULTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORAL CHAVEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?