SMITH v. O'MALLEY
Plaintiff: SHANNON SMITH
Defendant: Martin J O'Malley and MARTIN J. O'MALLEY
Case Number: 1:2024cv00299
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 05/14/2024, that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs is GRANTED, and Plaintiff is hereby permitted to proceed in this action in forma pauperis, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). The Clerk's Office is directed to issue a Notice of Service in accordance with Rule 3 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure's Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (cc)
May 14, 2024 Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. The Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Answer due 60 days from filing on this notice. Answer/Certified Administrative Record due by 7/15/2024. (cc)
April 8, 2024 Motions Referred: RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (cc)
April 8, 2024 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (cc)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by SHANNON SMITH.(DALTON, AARON)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by SHANNON SMITH. (DALTON, AARON) Modified on 4/5/2024 to remove parentheses. (cc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. O'MALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON SMITH
Represented By: AARON LEE DALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN J. O'MALLEY
Represented By: US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE-SOCIAL SECURITY NOTICING
Represented By: SSA NOTICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?