GRIFFIN v. O'MALLEY
Plaintiff: AMANDA GRIFFIN
Defendant: MARTIN O'MALLEY
Case Number: 1:2024cv00338
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 04/22/2024, that the plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. [28 U.S.C. 1915(a)]. The Court will apply the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). The Clerk's Office is directed to issue a Notice of Service pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) effective December 1, 2022. (cc)
April 22, 2024 Text Notice of Service in the Social Security Case Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. The Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Answer due 60 days from filing on this notice. Answer/Certified Administrative Record due by 6/21/2024. (cc)
April 19, 2024 Motions Referred: RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (cc)
April 19, 2024 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (cc)
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Amanda Griffin, filed by Amanda Griffin.(DALTON, AARON)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by Amanda Griffin. (DALTON, AARON) Modified on 4/19/2024 to correct punctuation. (cc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN v. O'MALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN O'MALLEY
Represented By: SSA NOTICING
Represented By: US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE-SOCIAL SECURITY NOTICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA GRIFFIN
Represented By: AARON LEE DALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?