KBML Associates, LLC
Debtor: KBML Associates, LLC
Trustee: Michael Leon Martinez
Us Trustee: U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
Case Number: 3:2024bk30296
Filed: April 2, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Craig Whitley
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2024 Filing 50 Trustee's Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting of Creditors CONTINUED - DEBTOR PREVIOUSLY SWORN (RE: related document(s)#48 Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting) 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/5/2024 at 02:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. (Scholz, BA)
May 22, 2024 Filing 49 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/21/2024 09:42:38 AM ].
May 21, 2024 Filing 48 Trustee's Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting of Creditors CONTINUED - DEBTOR(S) SWORN (RE: related document(s)#7 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors) 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/22/2024 at 01:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. (Scholz, BA)
May 21, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: SATISFIED (RE: related document(s)#19 Status Conference (SubchV)). (gav)
May 16, 2024 Filing 47 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#46 Use Cash Cash Collateral) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
May 16, 2024 Filing 46 Second Interim Order Granting Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #2) Hearing scheduled for June 4, 2024 at 9:30 AM in Charlotte, NC. (mt)
May 16, 2024 Filing 45 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#44 Application for Compensation filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
May 13, 2024 Filing 44 Application for Compensation to: Essex Richards, P.A. as attorney for debtor, Fee:$6,989.00, Expenses:$240.84. If a response or objection is filed - DUE: May 27, 2024, a hearing will be held on DATE: 6/4/2024, TIME: 9:30 AM, LOCATION: Charlotte CR #2B filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
May 8, 2024 Filing 43 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/07/2024 09:44:17 AM ].
May 8, 2024 Filing 42 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/07/2024 09:32:39 AM ].
May 7, 2024 Filing 41 Pre-Status Conference Report (RE: related document(s)#19 Status Conference (SubchV)) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
May 7, 2024 Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: APPROVED ON INTERIM BASIS, CONTINUED (Number of Times Continued: 2) (RE: related document(s)#2 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC, #23 Use Cash Cash Collateral). Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (cas)
May 3, 2024 Filing 40 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#36 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2024. (Admin.)
May 3, 2024 Filing 39 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#38 Order on Application to Employ) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
May 3, 2024 Filing 38 Ex Parte Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney (Related Doc #37) (cas)
May 2, 2024 Filing 37 Ex Parte Application w/Affidavit to Employ Professional Essex Richards, P.A. filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
May 1, 2024 Filing 36 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/1/2024 at 01:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. Proof of Claims due by 6/11/2024. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/1/2024. Re-docketed 341 meeting notice for the purpose of serving additional creditors added to the cases on 04/30/2024. (cas)
May 1, 2024 Receipt of Filing Fee for Receipt of Fee Payment(# 24-30296) ( 34.00). Receipt number A9841179, amount $ 34.00. (U.S. Treasury)
April 30, 2024 Filing 35 Amended Mailing Matrix to add two entities. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 30, 2024 Filing 34 Declaration, Statement of Financial Affairs, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, 106/206 Summary, Schedule H, Schedule G, Schedule E/F, Schedule D, Schedule A/B (RE: related document(s)#28 Order on Motion to Extend) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 30, 2024 Filing 33 Attorney Disclosure Statement (RE: related document(s)#28 Order on Motion to Extend) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 25, 2024 Filing 32 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#30 Order (other)) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 24, 2024 Filing 31 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#8 Order (other), #9 Certificate of Service filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office) filed by U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office. (Scholz, BA) Modified on 4/25/2024 (cas). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Docket text changed to include - Amended Certificate of Service.
April 24, 2024 Filing 30 Consent Order Rescheduling 341 Meeting of Creditors to May 8, 2024 at 2:00 pm. (RE: related document(s)#7 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors) (cas)
April 18, 2024 Filing 29 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#23 Use Cash Cash Collateral, #24 Order on Motion (Other), #26 Order on Motion (Other)) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 17, 2024 Filing 28 Ex Parte Order Granting Motion To Extend Time to file Missing Schedules and Statements by 04/30/2024 (Related Doc #27) Schedule A/B due 4/30/2024. Schedule D due 4/30/2024.Schedule E/F due4/30/2024. Schedule G due 4/30/2024. Schedule H due 4/30/2024. 106/206: Summary of schedules/Statistical Summary due 4/30/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/30/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/30/2024. Declaration due 4/30/2024 Atty Disclosure Statement due 4/30/2024. (cas)
April 16, 2024 Filing 27 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to file Missing Schedules and Statements. filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Granting Motion Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System and Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Business Forms (Related Doc #4) (cas)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Granting Motion Authorizing Debtor to Pay Pre-Petition Wages (Related Doc #3) (cas)
April 15, 2024 Filing 23 Interim Order Granting Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #2) Status hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 at 9:30 am in Charlotte, NC. (cas)
April 12, 2024 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#18 Order (other)). No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.)
April 12, 2024 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#19 Status Conference (SubchV)). No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 5/21/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B.Pre-Status Report Due By 5/7/2024. (jlb)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Rescinding Order Setting SubChapter V Status Conference. (RE: related document(s)#6 Status Conference (SubchV)) (jlb)
April 10, 2024 Filing 17 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 04/09/2024 09:50:47 AM ].
April 9, 2024 Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: CONTINUED; APPROVED ON AN INTERIM BASIS. (Number of Times Continued: 1) (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (mdw)
April 9, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: APPROVED (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll & Other Related Expenses) filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC). (mdw)
April 9, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: ALLOWED (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts & Cash Management System, AND (II) Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Business Forms filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC). (mdw)
April 8, 2024 Filing 16 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#2 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC, #3 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC, #4 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC, #11 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 5, 2024 Filing 15 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#6 Status Conference (SubchV)). No. of Notices: 22. Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
April 5, 2024 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#7 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors). No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
April 5, 2024 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#5 Notice of Deficient/Defective Filing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
April 5, 2024 Filing 12 Ex Parte Order Granting Motion to Shorten Notice (Related Doc #10) (cas)
April 4, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s)#2 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC, #3 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC, #4 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC, #10 Motion to Shorten Notice filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Woodman, John). Modified on 4/4/2024 (bfm).CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Docket text changed to remove relation to #10 Motion to Shorten Notice
April 4, 2024 Filing 10 Motion to Shorten Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC, #3 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC, #4 Motion (Other) filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC) filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#8 Order (other)) filed by U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office. (Scholz, BA)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 Subchapter V Operating Order. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC) (bfm)
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/1/2024 at 01:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. Proof of Claims due by 6/11/2024. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/1/2024. (jlb)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 4/23/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. Pre-Status Report Due By 4/9/2024. (jlb) Modified on 4/10/2024 (jlb). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: See Order #18.
April 3, 2024 Filing 5 Court Notice of Deficient Filing (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor KBML Associates, LLC). (jlb)
April 2, 2024 Filing 4 Motion OF THE DEBTOR FOR ENTRY OF ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING MAINTENANCE OF EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND (II) AUTHORIZING CONTINUED USE OF EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS. filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 2, 2024 Filing 3 Motion OF DEBTOR FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-PETITION PAYROLL, OTHER RELATED EXPENSES. filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 2, 2024 Filing 2 Motion to Use Cash Collateral EMERGENCY MOTION OF THE DEBTOR FOR AUTHORITY TO USE CASH COLLATERAL filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of KBML Associates, LLC. (Woodman, John)
April 2, 2024 Filing 1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 Subchapter V - (Woodman, John)
April 2, 2024 Bankruptcy Administrator's Notice of Appointment of Trustee: Michael Leon Martinez. (Abel, Shelley)

Search for this case: KBML Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: KBML Associates, LLC
Represented By: John C. Woodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Michael Leon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?