Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC
Debtor: Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC
Us Trustee: U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
Case Number: 3:2024bk30332
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Craig Whitley
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 30 Motion for Authority to Commence Monthly Payments to Secured Creditor. filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Johnson, R.)
June 5, 2024 Filing 29 Trustee's Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting of Creditors HELD - DEBTOR(S) SWORN (RE: related document(s)#27 Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting) (Scholz, BA)
June 4, 2024 Filing 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Renewed) filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Johnson, R.)
June 3, 2024 Filing 27 Trustee's Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting of Creditors CONTINUED - DEBTOR PREVIOUSLY SWORN (RE: related document(s)#25 Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting) 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/5/2024 at 01:30 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. (Scholz, BA)
June 3, 2024 Filing 26 Response and Request for Hearing (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Trident Realty Investments, LLC) Filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Johnson, R.)
June 3, 2024 Filing 25 Trustee's Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting of Creditors CONTINUED - DEBTOR NOT SWORN (RE: related document(s)#20 Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting) 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/5/2024 at 01:30 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. (Scholz, BA)
May 25, 2024 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#23 Order (other)). No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 05/25/2024. (Admin.)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Treating Show Cause as Satisfied. (RE: related document(s)#13 Order to Show Cause) (jlb)
May 22, 2024 Filing 22 Declaration, Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedule A/B and Summary (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC) filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. (Johnson, R.)
May 22, 2024 Filing 21 Courtroom Recording. Court Date & Time [ 05/21/2024 09:35:56 AM ].
May 21, 2024 Disposition of Hearing before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: CONTINUED (Number of Times Continued: 1) (RE: related document(s)#13 Order to Show Cause). Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (gav)
May 21, 2024 Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable J. Craig Whitley: WITHDRAWN (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Debtor Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC). (gav)
May 20, 2024 Filing 20 Trustee's Memorandum from 341(a) Meeting of Creditors CONTINUED - DEBTOR(S) SWORN (RE: related document(s)#6 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors) 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2024 at 02:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. (Scholz, BA)
May 17, 2024 Filing 19 Declaration, Schedule G and Summary (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC) filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. (Johnson, R.)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney (Related Doc #16) (jlb)
May 15, 2024 Filing 17 Amended Declaration, 106/206 Summary, Schedule H, Schedule D, Cover Sheet (LF19) Amended as Follows: Description Only w/ Certificate of Service. filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. (Johnson, R.)
May 15, 2024 Filing 16 Application w/Affidavit to Employ Attorney filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. (Johnson, R.)
May 10, 2024 Filing 15 Motion for Relief from Stay with Notice of Opportunity for Hearing (Fee Amount $ 199) If a response or objection is filed - DUE: 5/24/2024, a hearing will be held on DATE: 6/4/2024, TIME: 9:30AM, LOCATION: Charlotte - Courtroom 2B - PROPERTY DESCRIPTION: 1064 Salisbury Ridge Road, Winston-Salem, NC 27127. filed by Landon Glenn Van Winkle on behalf of Trident Realty Investments, LLC. (Van Winkle, Landon)
May 10, 2024 Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief from Stay(# 24-30332) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt number A9849930, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
May 9, 2024 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#13 Order to Show Cause). No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
May 7, 2024 Filing 13 Court Order to Appear and Show Cause for Dismissal of Case. (RE: related document(s)#5 Notice of Deficient/Defective Filing) Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/21/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (jlb)
April 26, 2024 Filing 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2024 at 09:30 AM at 3-JCW Courtroom 2B. (Johnson, R.)
April 19, 2024 Filing 11 Equity Security Holders List filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. (Johnson, R.)
April 19, 2024 Filing 10 Attorney Disclosure Statement (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC) filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. (Johnson, R.)
April 18, 2024 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#6 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors). No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
April 18, 2024 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#5 Notice of Deficient/Defective Filing). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Administrator's Notice to 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scholz, BA)
April 16, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/15/2024 at 01:00 PM at Zoom 341 Meeting. Proof of Claims due by 8/13/2024. (mt)
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 Court Notice of Deficient Filing (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC). (mt)
April 16, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#3 Order (other)) filed by Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. (Scholz, BA)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 Chapter 11 Operating Order. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC) (jlb)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 Corp. or Partn. Resolution filed by R. Keith Johnson on behalf of Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC. (Johnson, R.)
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 - Filing Fee Amount $ 1738 (Johnson, R.)
April 15, 2024 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11(# 24-30332) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A9777614, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gabriel Custom Homes, LLC
Represented By: R. Keith Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?