United States v. Lot 45, Grey Rock, Lake Lure, Rutherford County, North Carolina

Case Number: 1:2008cv00286
Filed: July 2, 2008
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Forfeit/Penalty: Other Office
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 21:881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the govt file a status report no later than close of business on 10/22/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/16/08. (pdf)
December 9, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Status Hearing/Conference set for 12/19/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/8/08. (ejb)
December 16, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on 12/16/08. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Lot 45, Grey Rock, Lake Lure, Rutherford County, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.